Rayford v. Mobile Phlebotomy of Central Michigan LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tonzania Rayford
Defendant: Mobile Phlebotomy of Central Michigan LLC, MPCM Services and Amanda Breasbois
Case Number: 1:2023cv13012
Filed: November 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Ludington
Referring Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2023 Filing 13 REPLY to Response re #9 MOTION For Supervised Notice Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b) filed by Tonzania Rayford. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Benion Opinion, #3 Exhibit 2 - Riley Opinion, #4 Exhibit 3 - Pryke Opinion, #5 Exhibit 4 - Brown Opinion, #6 Exhibit 5 - Westley Opinion, #7 Exhibit 6 - Michigan Credential Tip Sheet: CPT, #8 Exhibit 7 - 1/24/23 Email, #9 Exhibit 8 - 2/22/23 Email, #10 Exhibit 9 - 2/27/23 Email) (Blanchard, David)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT and SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/28/2024; Settlement Conference set for 7/10/2024 at 04:00 PM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington; Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 7/19/2024; Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/18/2024 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington; Jury Trial set for 1/14/2025 at 8:30 AM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (Refer to image for additional dates) (KWin)
December 21, 2023 Filing 11 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Blanchard, David)
December 15, 2023 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #9 MOTION For Supervised Notice Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b) AND BRIEF filed by All Defendants. (Miles, Errick)
December 12, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION For Supervised Notice Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b) by Tonzania Rayford. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Guy Opinion, #3 Exhibit 2 - Torres Opinion, #4 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Tonzania Rayford, #5 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of DeZandria King, #6 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Molly Kroening, #7 Exhibit 6 - Gifford Opinion, #8 Exhibit 7 - Rodriguez Opinion, #9 Exhibit 8 - Defendants' Motion to Change Venue, #10 Exhibit 9 - Proposed Notice and Consent Form, #11 Exhibit 10 - Benion Opinion, #12 Exhibit 11 - Smith Opinion, #13 Exhibit 12 - Anderson Opinion, #14 Exhibit 13 - Riley Opinion, #15 Exhibit 14 - Pryke Opinion, #16 Exhibit 15 - Nazih Opinion, #17 Exhibit 16 - Brown Opinion, #18 Exhibit 17 - Evans Opinion, #19 Exhibit 18 - Westley Opinion, #20 Exhibit 19 - Kidd Opinion, #21 Exhibit 20 - Craft Opinion, #22 Exhibit 21 - Sanchez Opinion) (Blanchard, David)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER to Submit Material for Case Management Order. (Short Statements Submitted to CM/ECF; Utilities; Proposed Orders by 12/21/2023. ) Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
December 5, 2023 Filing 7 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Mobile Phlebotomy of Central Michigan LLC (Miles, Errick)
December 5, 2023 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by All Defendants. (Miles, Errick)
December 1, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE by Tonzania Rayford - Filing Opt-In Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Opt-In Consent Forms) (Blanchard, David)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Defendants to Refile Pleadings. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
November 29, 2023 Filing 3 Docket Sheet from Michigan Western; Case Number 1:23-cv-01067.
November 29, 2023 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: This case has been transferred from the Western District of Michigan. Pending motions must be refiled on this court's docket by the filing party. Attorneys not admitted to practice in this court must complete the attorney admissions application and be admitted before appearing on this court's docket. All previously filed documents can be accessed on the originating court's docket using PACER. (VLun)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STIPULATION AND ORDER transferring venue; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs) [Transferred from miwd on 11/29/2023.]
November 29, 2023 Filing 1 TRANSFERREDCOMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Tonzania Rayford (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Rayford Consent Form) (Blanchard, David) Modified text on 10/10/2023 (ems). [Transferred from Michigan Western; Case Number 1:23-cv-01067.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rayford v. Mobile Phlebotomy of Central Michigan LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobile Phlebotomy of Central Michigan LLC
Represented By: Errick Alan Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MPCM Services
Represented By: Errick Alan Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Breasbois
Represented By: Errick Alan Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonzania Rayford
Represented By: Kelly Rebecca McClintock
Represented By: David M. Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?