Lamb v. Jones
Petitioner: David Lamb
Respondent: Carmen Palmer
Case Number: 2:2003cv73587
Filed: March 1, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
Presiding Judge: Paul J Komives
Presiding Judge: John Corbett O'Meara
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER transferring 132 Motion to amend application for writ of habes corpus to the United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit and denying 131 Motion to expand the record and for evidentiary hearing. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (DPer)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 127 OPINION and ORDER Denying in part the Rule 60(B) Motion for Relief from Judgment, and Transferring Case to USCA for the Sixth Circuit. Signed by District Judge John Corbett O'Meara. (SSch)
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER denying 118 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge John Corbett O'Meara. (WBar)
August 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER Adopting 115 Report and Recommendation re 112 Motion for Certificate of Appealability filed by David Lamb. Signed by District Judge John Corbett O'Meara. (WBar)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Adopting 106 Report and Recommendation re 104 Motion Pursuant to Rule 60(b); and Denying Motion for Certificate of Appealability, and Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge John Corbett O'Meara. (WBar)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 106 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 100 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by David Lamb, 104 MOTION pursuant to Rule 60B filed by David Lamb Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul J Komives. (EBut)
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER Adopting 79 Report and Recommendation Signed by District Judge John Corbett O'Meara. (WBar)
September 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 79 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Petition Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul J Komives. (EBut)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lamb v. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Lamb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Carmen Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?