United States Securities and Exchange Commission v. Delphi Corporation et al
Case Number: 2:2006cv14891
Filed: October 30, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Unassigned
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 380 Final JUDGMENT as to Defendant J.T. Battenberg, III. Judgment in the amount of $ 215,000.00. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (JOwe)
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 375 Amendment to 333 Partial JUDGMENT- Liability Only - As to J.T. Battenberg,III and Paul Free entered on March 08, 2011 Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (JOwe)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 333 Partial JUDGMENT - Liability Only - As to J.T. Battenberg,III and Paul Free Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (JOwe)
October 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (JOwe)
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 237 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding Motion in Limine re: denied without prejudice 218 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denied in part 219 Sealed Motion; denied without prejudice 220 Motion in Limine; denied without prejudice 221 Motion in Limine; denied without prejudice 222 Motion in Limine; denied 223 Motion in Limine. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (JOwe)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 234 AMENDMENT to 216 Trial Order, :( Motion Hearing on All Motions in Limine set for 9/23/2010 02:00 PM before District Judge Avern Cohn) Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MWil)
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 212 MEMORANDUM and ORDER denying 156 J.T. Battenberg's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 164 Paul Free's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 167 Milan Belans' Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (JOwe)
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 211 MEMORANDUM and ORDER denying 153 John Blahnik's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (JOwe)
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 188 MEMORANDUM, Responses due by 12/17/2009, Motion Hearing set for 1/26/2010 10:00 AM before District Judge Avern Cohn) Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (JOwe)
October 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 187 MEMORANDUM and ORDER denying 163 Battenberg's Motion to Strike Jury Demand. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (JOwe)
October 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MEMORANDUM and ORDER denying Defendants' 36 Motion to Dismiss; denying 38 Motion to Dismiss; denying 39 Motion to Dismiss; denying 40 Motion to Dismiss; denying 41 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (JOwe)
September 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER Setting Pretrial and Scheduling Conference., ( Pretrial Conference set for 10/10/2008 10:00 AM before District Judge Avern Cohn) Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (JOwe)
November 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FINAL JUDGMENT as to defendant Delphi Corporation. Signed by Honorable Avern Cohn. (DPer, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Securities and Exchange Commission v. Delphi Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?