Roehm v. Wal-Mart Stores, Incorporated Featured Case

Plaintiff Julie Ann Roehm alleged that defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. terminated her without cause, made false and malicious statements to the media, and retained her personal files and property.

Plaintiff: Julie Ann Roehm
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Incorporated
Counter Claimant: Wal-Mart Stores, Incorporated
Counter Defendant: Julie Ann Roehm
Case Number: 2:2007cv10168
Filed: January 10, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Oakland
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Presiding Judge: Lawrence P Zatkoff
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: No cause code entered
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2007 Filing 27
ACKNOWLEDGMENT from Oakland County Circuit Court of 25 Order on Motion to Remand. (RHut)
June 5, 2007 Filing 26
NOTICE remanding case to *Oakland County Circuit Court*. (LHac)
June 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 25
OPINION AND ORDER granting 12 Motion to Remand to Oakland County Circuit Court. Signed by Honorable Lawrence P Zatkoff. (LHac)
May 29, 2007 Filing 23
ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY by Wal-Mart Stores, Incorporated. (McCulloch, Debra)
May 24, 2007 Filing 21
REPLY to Defendant's Counterclaim by Julie Ann Roehm. (Rifkin, B.)
May 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 17
STIPULATION AND ORDER Signed by Honorable Lawrence P Zatkoff. (MVer)
May 10, 2007 Filing 16
AFFIDAVIT of Julie Ann Roehm re 12 MOTION to Remand by Julie Ann Roehm (Morgan, Sam)
April 24, 2007 Filing 15
COUNTERCLAIM filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Incorporated against Julie Ann Roehm (McCulloch, Debra)
April 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 14
SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/17/2008 10:30 AM before Honorable Lawrence P Zatkoff,Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 12/7/2007,Discovery due by 11/15/2007 Signed by Honorable Lawrence P Zatkoff. (Refer to image for additional dates) (MVer)
April 10, 2007 Filing 10
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Sam G. Morgan appearing on behalf of Julie Ann Roehm as Co-Counsel (Morgan, Sam)
March 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 8
STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Inadvertent Production of Privledged or Protected Trial Preparation Documents Signed by Honorable Lawrence P Zatkoff. (AGre)
February 9, 2007 Filing 6
NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 4/17/2007 09:30 AM before Honorable Lawrence P Zatkoff. (MVer, )
February 1, 2007 Filing 5
(FILING ERROR: DISCOVERY/STRICKEN) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wal-Mart Stores, Incorporated of Notice of Deposition of Shelley Womack.(Ritok, Joseph) Modified on 2/2/2007 (RHutc, ).
January 26, 2007 Filing 4
AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Julie Ann Roehm.(Rifkin, B.)
January 19, 2007 Filing 3
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Wal-Mart Stores, Incorporated.(McCulloch, Debra)
January 18, 2007 Filing 2
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Wal-Mart Stores, Incorporated.(McCulloch, Debra)
January 10, 2007 Filing 1
NOTICE of Removal from Oakland County, case #06-079562-CK filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Incorporated against Julie Ann Roehm. Receipt No: 38994 - Fee: $350.(KGeha, ) Modified on 1/29/2007 (KGeha, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roehm v. Wal-Mart Stores, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Ann Roehm
Represented By: John F. Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Incorporated
Represented By: Eugene Scalia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Wal-Mart Stores, Incorporated
Represented By: Eugene Scalia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Julie Ann Roehm
Represented By: John F. Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?