Station Enterprises, Incorporated v. Ganz Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Station Enterprises, Incorporated
Defendant: Ganz Incorporated and Ganz USA, LLC
Case Number: 2:2007cv14294
Filed: October 10, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Washtenaw
Presiding Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Presiding Judge: George Caram Steeh
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: No cause code entered
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 123 OPINION and ORDER denying 111 Sealed Motion; granting 113 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K Majzoub. (DGoo)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Motion for Summary Judgment 71 (Sealed Motion). Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
February 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER striking 55 Motion to Strike - Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K Majzoub. (LBar)
January 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting in part 26 Motion to Compel; granting in part, 27 Motion to Compel, granting 40 Motion to Expedite Hearing and denying as moot 41 Motion - Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K Majzoub. (LBar)
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Adopting 25 Report and Recommendation for 17 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Ganz USA, LLC, Ganz Incorporated. Motions terminated: 17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ganz USA, LLC, Ganz Incorporated. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (KMil)
November 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
September 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 25 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 17 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure of the Plaintiff's Owners to Appear for Their Depositions and Plaintiff's Failure to Answer Defendants' Discovery Requests - Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K Majzoub. (LBar)
September 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 13 Motion to Compel Discovery and Ordering Hans and Patricia Masing to Appear for Deposition 17 - Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K Majzoub. (LBar)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Station Enterprises, Incorporated v. Ganz Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ganz Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ganz USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Station Enterprises, Incorporated
Represented By: Jonathan C. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?