Lifestyle Lift Holding, Incorporated v. Real Self, Incorporated Featured Case

Plaintiff: Lifestyle Lift Holding, Incorporated
Defendant: Real Self, Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2008cv10089
Filed: January 7, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Oakland
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Duggan
Presiding Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: No cause code entered
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2008 Filing 18 Trademark Report Sent To Washington (VLu2)
May 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATED ORDER DISMISSING CASE Signed by District Judge Patrick J Duggan. (MOre)
April 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATED ORDER to Extend Time to Response re 13 MOTION to Dismiss Counter-Claim filed filed by Lifestyle Lift Holding, Incorporated, Scientific Image Center Management, Incorporated AND CANCELLING CONFERENCE SET FOR 5/5/08. Responses due by 5/16/2008 Signed by District Judge Patrick J Duggan. (MOre)
April 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATED ORDER to Extend Time to Response re 13 MOTION to Dismiss Counter-Claim filed filed by Lifestyle Lift Holding, Incorporated, Scientific Image Center Management, Incorporated. Responses due by 5/2/2008 Signed by District Judge Patrick J Duggan. (MOre)
March 31, 2008 Minute Entry -Status Conference held on 3/31/2008, Set Deadlines/Hearings:( Scheduling Conference set for 5/5/2008 02:30 PM before District Judge Patrick J Duggan) before District Judge Patrick J Duggan. (MOre)
March 24, 2008 Filing 14 NOTICE REGARDING MOTION PRACTICE (MOre)
March 21, 2008 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Counter-Claim filed by Scientific Image Center Management, Incorporated, Lifestyle Lift Holding, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A- Real Self Web Site, Terms and Conditions, and User Pages, # 3 Exhibit B - Unpublished Case - Lockheed Martin Corp. v. Speed, 2006 U.S. Dist. Lexis 53108, (M.D. Fla. 2006), # 4 Exhibit C - Unpublished Case - Southwest Airlines Co. v. BoardFirst, L.L.C., 2007 U.S. Dist. Lexis 96230 (N. D. Tex. 2007), # 5 Exhibit D - Unpublished Case - B&B Microscopes v. Armogida, 2007 U.S. Dist. Lexis 70978 (E. D. Pa. 2007), # 6 Exhibit E - Unpublished Case - Diamond Power Int'l, Inc. v. Davidson, 2007 U.S. Dist Lexis 73032, 48-49 (N. D. Ga. 2007)) (Rubin, Allan)
March 14, 2008 Filing 12 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 3/31/2008 02:00 PM before Honorable Patrick J Duggan (MOre)
March 5, 2008 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Scientific Image Center Management, Incorporated served on 3/3/2008, answer due 3/24/2008. (Swedlow, Deborah)
March 4, 2008 Filing 10 THIRD-PARTY SUMMONS Issued for Scientific Image Center Management, Inc. (VLun)
March 3, 2008 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Allan S. Rubin on behalf of Scientific Image Center Management, Inc., Lifestyle Lift Holding, Incorporated. (Rubin, Allan)
March 3, 2008 REQUEST for SUMMONS for Scientific Image Center Management, Inc.. (Swedlow, Deborah)
March 3, 2008 Filing 8 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Real Self, Incorporated (Swedlow, Deborah)
March 3, 2008 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM filed by Real Self, Incorporated against Scientific Image Center Management, Inc., Lifestyle Lift Holding, Incorporated by Real Self, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A - Terms of Use) (Swedlow, Deborah)
March 3, 2008 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Lowe on behalf of Real Self, Incorporated. (Lowe, Timothy)
March 3, 2008 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Michael Huget on behalf of Real Self, Incorporated. (Huget, J.)
March 3, 2008 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah J. Swedlow on behalf of Real Self, Incorporated. (Swedlow, Deborah)
January 25, 2008 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Real Self, Incorporated served on 1/11/2008, answer due 1/31/2008. (McKinnon, Michael)
January 7, 2008 Filing 2 TRADEMARK Report Sent To Washington (DHam)
January 7, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with exhibits filed by Lifestyle Lift Holding, Incorporated against Real Self, Incorporated Receipt No: 566023 - Fee: $ 350. (DHam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lifestyle Lift Holding, Incorporated v. Real Self, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lifestyle Lift Holding, Incorporated
Represented By: Michael C. McKinnon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Self, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?