Bourdganis v. Northern Trust Bank
Plaintiff: Cathryn Bourdganis
Defendant: Northern Trust Bank
Case Number: 2:2008cv11282
Filed: March 25, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Duggan
Presiding Judge: Majzoub
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATED ORDER DISMISSING CASE Signed by District Judge Patrick J Duggan. (MOre)
February 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER ESTABLISHING TRIAL DOCKET. Signed by District Judge Patrick J Duggan. (MOre)
November 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER ALLOWING FILNG OF AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by District Judge Patrick J Duggan. (MOre)
October 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 11 Motion to Compel and for Sancations; and granting in part and denying in part 15 Motion to Compel - Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K Majzoub. (LBar)
October 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ESTABLISHING TRIAL DOCKET. Signed by District Judge Patrick J Duggan. (MOre)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bourdganis v. Northern Trust Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Trust Bank
Represented By: Jonathan T. Walton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathryn Bourdganis
Represented By: Michael M. Wachsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?