Premier Capital, LLC v. Karcho-Polselli et al
Plaintiff: Premier Capital, LLC
Defendant: Pacific XX, Inc, Peter M Schneiderman and Associates, PC and Hanna Karcho-Polselli
Case Number: 2:2008cv11906
Filed: May 5, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Oakland
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Morgan
Referring Judge: George Caram Steeh
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER determining title to funds and compelling payment pursuant to writ of garnishment (granting #49 Motion for Disbursement of Funds) Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
December 7, 2011 Minute Entry - Motion Hearing held on 12/7/2011 re #49 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds filed by Hanna Karcho-Polselli before District Judge George Caram Steeh. Disposition: Granted (attorney to submit proposed order)(Court Reporter Ron DiBartolomeo) (MBea)
November 7, 2011 Filing 50 NOTICE of hearing on #49 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds. Responses due by 11/21/2011 Replies due by 12/2/2011 Motion Hearing set for 12/7/2011 01:30 PM before District Judge George Caram Steeh (MBea)
November 2, 2011 Filing 49 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds by Hanna Karcho-Polselli. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E) (Black, Andrew)
October 1, 2008 Filing 48 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE regarding the return of seal material, the stock certificate of Pacific XX, Inc. and assignment separate for certificate, to defendants' cousel. (SSro)
September 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATED ORDER DISMISSING CASE Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSoc)
September 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER for release and delivery of funds by Wachovia Securities. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
September 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION AND ORDER for release and delivery of funds by the clerk. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
August 26, 2008 Filing 44 REPLY to Response re #33 MOTION for Summary Judgment and to dismiss counterclaim filed by Premier Capital, LLC. (Walton, Jonathan)
August 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER for deposit of funds. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
August 19, 2008 Minute Entry -Miscellaneous Hearing held on 8/19/2008 re: deposit of funds before District Judge George Caram Steeh. (Court Reporter Ron DiBartolomeo) (MBea)
August 19, 2008 Minute Entry -Settlement Conference held on 8/19/2008 before District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
August 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER directing Clerk to accept and hold two cashier's checks. Miscellaneous Hearing set for 8/19/2008 10:00 AM before District Judge George Caram Steeh Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
August 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
August 14, 2008 Minute Entry -Motion Hearing held on 8/14/2008 re #6 Ex Parte MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Premier Capital, LLC before District Judge George Caram Steeh. Disposition: Granted(Court Reporter Ron DiBartolomeo) (MBea)
August 8, 2008 Filing 40 August 14, 2008 Hearing WITNESS LIST by Hanna Karcho-Polselli, Pacific XX, Inc (Black, Andrew)
August 8, 2008 Filing 39 TRIAL BRIEF for August 14, 2008 Hearing by Hanna Karcho-Polselli, Pacific XX, Inc (Black, Andrew)
August 7, 2008 Filing 38 RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Hanna Karcho-Polselli, Pacific XX, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Promissory Note, #3 Exhibit Affidavit) (Black, Andrew)
August 7, 2008 Filing 37 STATEMENT of Resolved and Unresolved Issues by Premier Capital, LLC (Walton, Jonathan)
August 7, 2008 Filing 36 Preliminary injunction hearing WITNESS LIST by Premier Capital, LLC (Walton, Jonathan)
August 7, 2008 Filing 35 TRIAL BRIEF for preliminary injunction hearing by Premier Capital, LLC (Walton, Jonathan)
July 21, 2008 Filing 34 NOTICE of hearing on #33 MOTION for Summary Judgment and to dismiss counterclaim. Responses due by 8/7/2008 Replies due by 8/26/2008 Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2008 10:00 AM before District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
July 14, 2008 Filing 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment and to dismiss counterclaim by Premier Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1-FDIC press release regarding closure and receivership of Miami Valley Bank, #3 Exhibit 2-Promissory note dated October 12, 2004, #4 Exhibit 3-Guaranty dated October 12, 2004, #5 Exhibit 4-Declaration of John Cummings, #6 Exhibit 5-Declaration of Jonathan T. Walton, Jr., #7 Exhibit 6-Extension request dated September 6, 2007) (Walton, Jonathan)
June 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Continuing and Modifying Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
June 27, 2008 Attorney Craig A. Aronoff is discontinued from receiving Notices of Electronic Filing. Reason: Dismissed from case June 19, 2008. on behalf of Def. Peter M. Schneiderman & Associates, P.C. (Aronoff, Craig)
June 24, 2008 Filing 31 NOTICE by Pacific XX, Inc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations (Black, Andrew)
June 20, 2008 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hanna Karcho-Polselli, Pacific XX, Inc re #28 Answer to Complaint, #29 Counterclaim (Findling, Fred)
June 20, 2008 Filing 29 COUNTERCLAIM filed by Hanna Karcho-Polselli, Pacific XX, Inc against Premier Capital, LLC (Findling, Fred)
June 20, 2008 Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Hanna Karcho-Polselli, Pacific XX, Inc. (Findling, Fred)
June 20, 2008 Filing 25 NOTICE of hearing on #6 Preliminary Injunction and for Possession of Property Final Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 8/14/2008 09:30 AM before District Judge George Caram Steeh. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation) (MBea)
June 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying #22 Plaintiff's Motion early discovery; denying #23 Motion to Expedite as Moot. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
June 20, 2008 Minute Entry -Motion Hearing held on 6/20/2008 re #6 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause, Preliminary Injunction and for Possession of Property Final Judgment filed by Premier Capital, LLC, - TRO CONTINUED; #11 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP Rule 12 and FRCP Rule 67 for an Order Allowing Deposit of a Stock Certificate with the Court filed by Peter M Schneiderman and Associates, PC, - GRANTED; #22 MOTION for early discovery filed by Premier Capital, LLC, and #23 MOTION to Expedite hearing on Plaintiff's motion for early discovery filed by Premier Capital, LLC - DENIED AS MOOT - before District Judge George Caram Steeh. (Court Reporter Ron DiBartolomeo) (MBea)
June 19, 2008 Filing 27 Sealed Matter.(CGre) Sent sealed matter back to defendant's attorney per 9/26/08 order. Modified on 9/26/2008 (SSro).
June 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (CGre)
June 13, 2008 Filing 23 MOTION to Expedite hearing on Plaintiff's motion for early discovery by Premier Capital, LLC. (Walton, Jonathan)
June 12, 2008 Filing 22 MOTION for early discovery by Premier Capital, LLC. (Walton, Jonathan)
June 11, 2008 Filing 21 NOTICE of hearing on #11 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP Rule 12 and FRCP Rule 67 for an Order Allowing Deposit of a Stock Certificate with the Court. Motion Hearing set for 6/19/2008 10:00 AM before District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
June 5, 2008 Filing 20 NOTICE of hearing on #6 Ex Parte Motion for Preliminary Injunction and for Possession of Property Final Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 6/19/2008 10:00 AM before District Judge George Caram Steeh. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation) (MBea)
May 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Continuing Temporary Restraining Order and Permitting Inspection of Security by Plaintiff. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
May 27, 2008 Minute Entry -Motion Hearing held on 5/27/2008 re #6 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause, Preliminary Injunction and for Possession of Property Final Judgment filed by Premier Capital, LLC before District Judge George Caram Steeh. Disposition: TRO extended(Court Reporter Ron DiBartolomeo) (MBea)
May 23, 2008 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Premier Capital, LLC re #17 Declaration (Michael, David)
May 23, 2008 Filing 17 DECLARATION by Court Officer Donald T. Fiema filed by Premier Capital, LLC (Michael, David)
May 23, 2008 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Premier Capital, LLC re #15 Declaration (Michael, David)
May 23, 2008 Filing 15 DECLARATION by Court Officer Donald T. Fiema filed by Premier Capital, LLC (Michael, David)
May 22, 2008 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #6 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause, Preliminary Injunction and for Possession of Property Final Judgment filed by Hanna Karcho-Polselli, Pacific XX, Inc. (Black, Andrew)
May 22, 2008 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Hanna Karcho-Polselli served on 5/19/2008, answer due 6/9/2008. (Michael, David)
May 22, 2008 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Hanna Karcho-Polselli served on 5/17/2008, answer due 6/6/2008. (Michael, David)
May 16, 2008 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP Rule 12 and FRCP Rule 67 for an Order Allowing Deposit of a Stock Certificate with the Court by Peter M Schneiderman and Associates, PC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Stock Certificate & Assignment Separate from Certificate, #3 Exhibit Escrow Agreement, #4 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Aronoff, Craig)
May 16, 2008 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Craig A. Aronoff appearing on behalf of Peter M Schneiderman and Associates, PC Appearance and Notice (Aronoff, Craig)
May 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER for Hanna Karcho-Polselli, Pacific XX, Inc to SHOW CAUSE why an order should not be issued to take personal property as collateral. Hearing set for 5/23/2008 10:30 AM before District Judge George Caram Steeh. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (DOpa)
May 13, 2008 Minute Entry - Status Conference held on 5/13/2008 before District Judge George Caram Steeh. (DOpa)
May 8, 2008 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #6 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause, Preliminary Injunction and for Possession of Property Final Judgment filed by Premier Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Correspondence and call records) (Walton, Jonathan)
May 8, 2008 Filing 7 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Status Conference set for 5/14/2008 10:30 AM before District Judge George Caram Steeh (MBea)
May 7, 2008 Filing 6 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause, Preliminary Injunction and for Possession of Property Final Judgment by Premier Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Promissory note, #3 Exhibit Stock certificate, #4 Exhibit Security and pledge agreement, #5 Exhibit Financing statement, #6 Exhibit Escrow agreement, #7 Exhibit Security agreement, #8 Exhibit Financing statement, #9 Exhibit Guaranty agreement, #10 Exhibit Allonge, #11 Exhibit Defendants' financial statements, #12 Exhibit III Finance Ltd. v. The Aegis Consumer Funding Group, Inc.,) (Walton, Jonathan)
May 7, 2008 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Peter M Schneiderman and Associates, PC* (SSch)
May 7, 2008 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Pacific XX, Inc* (SSch)
May 7, 2008 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Hanna Karcho-Polselli* (SSch)
May 5, 2008 Filing 2 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: David G. Michael appearing on behalf of Premier Capital, LLC (Michael, David)
May 5, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Premier Capital, LLC against all defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 06450000000001522414 - Fee: $ 350. County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1-Promissory note, #3 Exhibit 2-Stock certificate, #4 Exhibit 3-Security and pledge agreement, #5 Exhibit 4-Financing statement, #6 Exhibit 5-Escrow agreement, #7 Exhibit 6-Security agreement, #8 Exhibit 7-Financing statement, #9 Exhibit 8-Guaranty agreement, #10 Exhibit 9-Allonge) (Walton, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Premier Capital, LLC v. Karcho-Polselli et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific XX, Inc
Represented By: Andrew J. Black
Represented By: Fred S. Findling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter M Schneiderman and Associates, PC
Represented By: Craig A. Aronoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanna Karcho-Polselli
Represented By: Andrew J. Black
Represented By: Fred S. Findling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Premier Capital, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan T. Walton, Jr.
Represented By: David G. Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?