LaFrance v. Grand River Navigation Company, Incorporated
Plaintiff: Marc LaFrance
Defendant: Grand River Navigation Company, Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2008cv13411
Filed: August 6, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Komives
Presiding Judge: Zatkoff
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688 Jones Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER denying 47 Motion for New Trial. Signed by District Judge Lawrence P. Zatkoff. (MVer)
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER denying 19 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 20 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 25 Motion in Limine. Signed by District Judge Lawrence P Zatkoff. (MVer)
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 OPINION and ORDER REGARDING JURY INSTRUCTIONS Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (SJef)
June 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER REGARDING JURY INSTRUCTIONS Signed by District Judge Lawrence P Zatkoff. (MVer)
December 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying 4 Motion to Dismiss; denying 7 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by District Judge Lawrence P Zatkoff. (MVer)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LaFrance v. Grand River Navigation Company, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc LaFrance
Represented By: George T. Fishback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand River Navigation Company, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?