Chamberlain v. Reddy Ice Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: John Chamberlain
Defendant: Jimmy C. Weaver, Reddy Ice Holdings, Inc., William P Brick and Steven J. Janusek
Case Number: 2:2008cv13451
Filed: August 8, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Lawson
Presiding Judge: Whalen
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 12:22 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER requiring submisson of documents to the Court for in camera review re 92 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney (Unopposed) filed by Jimmy C Weaver. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DGoo)
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 87 OPINION and ORDER granting 39 Motion to Dismiss; denying 41 Motion to Dismiss; denying 43 Motion to Dismiss; denying 78 Motion to Dismiss; granting 82 Motion to supplement. Signed by District Judge Paul D Borman. (DGoo)
April 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 OPINION ORDER AFFIRMING THE MAGISTRATE JUDGES FEBRUARY 18, 2010 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STRIKE re 60 Order on Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge Paul D Borman. (DGoo)
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER MODIFYING THE COURTS JULY 27, 2009 ORDER APPOINTING INTERIMLEAD PLAINTIFF AND INTERIM LEAD COUNSEL re 28 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by District Judge Paul D Borman. (DGoo)
July 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 10 Motion to Appoint INTERIM LEAD PLAINTIFF AND INTERIM LEAD Counsel. Signed by District Judge Paul D Borman. (DGoo)
July 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting 9 Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting 10 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by District Judge Paul D Borman. (DGoo)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chamberlain v. Reddy Ice Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy C. Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reddy Ice Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P Brick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven J. Janusek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Chamberlain
Represented By: Thomas C. Michaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?