Howard v. Wayne County Sheriffs Office, et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Howard
Defendant: John Hardie, Wayne County Sheriffs Office and Frank Wood
Case Number: 2:2008cv13501
Filed: August 13, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Duggan
Presiding Judge: Whalen
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 JUDGMENT Signed by District Judge Patrick J. Duggan. (MOre)
July 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting 49 Motion in Limine; granting 51 Motion in Limine. Signed by District Judge Patrick J. Duggan. (MOre)
July 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 OPINION AND ORDER denying 47 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Patrick J. Duggan. (MOre)
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER ESTABLISHING TRIAL DOCKET FOR JULY/AUGUST, 2011. Signed by District Judge Patrick J. Duggan. (MOre)
September 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 JUDGMENT Signed by District Judge Patrick J Duggan. (MOre)
June 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER ESTABLISHING TRIAL DOCKET. Signed by District Judge Patrick J Duggan. (MOre)
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 OPINION AND ORDER denying 17 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Patrick J Duggan. (MOre)
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ESTABLISHING TRIAL DOCKET FOR MAY/JUNE, 2009. Signed by District Judge Patrick J Duggan. (MOre)
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 10 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by District Judge Patrick J Duggan. (MOre)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. Wayne County Sheriffs Office, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hardie
Represented By: James M. Surowiec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne County Sheriffs Office
Represented By: James M. Surowiec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Wood
Represented By: James M. Surowiec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?