Ford Motor Company et al v. Michigan Consolidated Gas Company
Plaintiff: Ford Motor Company and Severstal North America, Incorporated
Defendant: Michigan Consolidated Gas Company
Case Number: 2:2008cv13503
Filed: August 13, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Cleland
Presiding Judge: Majzoub
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:9607 Real Property Tort to Land
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 188 Motion to Compel - Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (LBar)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 187 OPINION AND ORDER denying 185 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 182 OPINION AND ORDER granting 154 Motion to Certify Decree for Appeal ; granting 162 United States' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 171 OPINION AND ORDER denying 165 Motion to Strike; granting 166 Motion to Stayand setting briefing schedule for 162 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 148 OPINION AND ORDER denying 120 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER denying 127 Motion to Compel- Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (LBar)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 116 CONSENT DECREE Dismissing all Claims by plaintiffs against the United States of America with prejudice (See Consent Decree for Details) and Directs Entry of Final Judgment in accordance with the terms of the Decree. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
September 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 115 OPINION AND ORDER granting 106 Plaintiffs' Motion for entry of consent decree. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER denying without prejudice defendant's motion. 84 Motion to Compel. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (Bankston, T)
November 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER GRANTING 85 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or other Response to Third-Party Complaint filed by United States of America; HOLDING IN ABEYANCE 84 MOTION to Compel Proper Discovery from Ford Motor Company filed by Mi chigan Consolidated Gas Company; Setting Deadline of 11/30/2011 for Plaintiff to File a Motion or Stipulation to Amend and setting a ( Telephone Conference for 12/7/2011 11:00 AM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland) Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
May 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 OPINION AND ORDER granting 58 Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration and for leave to file counterclaim; granting 61 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Third Party Complaint and setting deadline to file pleadings. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
August 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 OPINION AND ORDER granting 42 Plaintiffs' Partial Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Robert H Cleland. (LWag)
January 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER for facilitation and suspending all court-supervised activities pending the parties' voluntary facilitation. (see order for details) Signed by District Judge Robert H Cleland. (LWag)
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATED ORDER Suspending Briefing re 42 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaim filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by District Judge Robert H Cleland. (LWag)
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Setting Deadlines and Canceling Scheduling Conference. Signed by District Judge Robert H Cleland. (LWag)
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER setting Telephone and Scheduling Conferences, ( Telephone Conference set for 11/19/2009 11:00 AM before District Judge Robert H Cleland, Scheduling Conference set for 11/30/2009 02:30 PM before District Judge Robert H Cleland) Signed by District Judge Robert H Cleland. (LWag)
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 13 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 21 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Robert H Cleland. (LWag)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford Motor Company et al v. Michigan Consolidated Gas Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: D. Lee Khachaturian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Severstal North America, Incorporated
Represented By: Robert V. Campedel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Consolidated Gas Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?