JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. v. Winget et al
Plaintiff: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Larry J Winget and Larry J Winget Living Trust
Case Number: 2:2008cv13845
Filed: September 8, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Cohn
Presiding Judge: Hluchaniuk
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 986 OPINION AND ORDER Overruling Objections, Adopting Special Master's Report and Recommendation, Granting in Part 926 Sealed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Imposing Constructive Trust, Denying Defendants' 971 Motion for Summary Judg ment, Denying Defendants' 974 Motion to Stay Collection Proceedings, and Granting 979 Motion for Status Conference. Status Conference set for 1/20/2021 at 9:00 AM via Zoom before District Judge David M. Lawson. Zoom Notice to Follow. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 936 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENYING WINGETS MOTION TO AMEND THE COURTS JULY 5, 2017 ORDER AND SEEK IMMEDIATE INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL (ECF No. 928). Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (MVer)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 919 AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF SPECIAL MASTER (ECF No. 906) Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 918 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER LIFTING STAY AND GRANTING CHASES MOTION FOR COSTS AND EXPENSES (ECF No. 862). Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 855 MEMORANDUM FOLLOWING AUGUST 14, 2018 HEARING AND ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS ON CHASES FRAUDULENT TRANSFER CLAIMS Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 834 ORDER DENYING WINGET'S MOTION TO COMPEL [DOC. 827]. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 788 ORDER granting 782 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 773 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTING CHASE'S MOTION FOR COSTS AND EXPENSES re 709 MOTION for Costs And Expenses Of Collection Pursuannt To Final Judgment filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 770 ORDER GRANTING CHASE'S MOTION TO STRIKE JURY DEMAND 755 . Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 751 ORDER DENYING 734 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 737 ORDER DENYING WINGET'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER GRANTING CHASE'S MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH COURT ORDER 733 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 732 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS ON CHASES CHASES SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR COSTS AND EXPENSES OF COLLECTION PURSUANT TO FINAL JUDGMENT (Doc. 709) AND GRANTING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS (Doc. 699) AND GRANTING CHASES MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH COURT ORDER (Doc. 719) AND GRANTING CHASES MOTION TO COMPEL (Doc. 720). Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 700 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTING CHASES MOTION TO COMPEL (Doc. 692) AND DENYING WINGETS MOTION TO COMPEL (Doc. 695). Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 683 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENYING LARRY J. WINGET'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT (DOC. 672). Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 679 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENYING LARRY J. WINGETS MOTION FOR STAY WITHOUT BOND PENDING RESOLUTION OF WINGETS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT (Doc. 675). Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 671 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART CHASES MOTION FOR COSTS AND EXPENSES OF COLLECTION PURSUANT TO ORDER OF FINAL JUDGMENT (Doc. 563). Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 668 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE LARRY J. WINGETS MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER (Doc. 662). Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 626 AMENDED ORDER REGARDING LARRY J. WINGETS MOTION TO QUASH WRITS OF GARNISHMENT (Doc. 611) AND MOTION TO INTERVENE (Doc. 610). Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (SCha)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 623 ORDER REGARDING LARRY J. WINGETS MOTION TO QUASH WRITS OF GARNISHMENT (Doc. 611) AND MOTION TO INTERVENE (Doc. 610) Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (SCha)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 567 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT (Doc. 557). Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 542 Memorandum and Order Denying Winget's 524 Motion for Costs and Attorney Fees. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (SCha)
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 488 MEMORANDUM regarding Final re 487 Judgment. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (CBet)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 478 MEMORANDUM and ORDER Denying Defendants'/Counter-Plaintiffs' 380 Motion for Sanctions against Attorney William Burgess pursuant to 28 USC 1927. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (CBet)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 470 AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re 469 granting Chase's Motion for Entry of Final Judgment 454 . Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (CBet)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 469 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Granting Chase's 454 Motion for Entry of Final Judgment. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (CBet)
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 450 Memorandum and Order Granting Chase's 391 Motion for Summary Judgment on Winget's Enforceability and Delay Defenses, ( Status Conference set for 9/24/2013 02:00 PM before District Judge Avern Cohn) Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (SCha)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 449 Memorandum and Order Denying Winget's Renewed 403 Motion to Defer Consideration of Chase's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (SCha)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 379 Scheduling ORDER. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (JOwe)
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 372 AMENDED 368 JUDGMENT on Reformation in favor of Defendants Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (JOwe)
October 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 368 JUDGMENT on Reformation in favor of Defendants Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (JOwe)
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER denying 345 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Count 1 Based on Res Judicata. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (JOwe)
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 354 MEMORANDUM and ORDER denying without prejudice 334 Winget's Motion for Reconsideration of 321 Order Regarding Winget's Motion to Compel Discovery on Counts II and III and 342 Chase's Motion for Protective Order Prohibiting Winget from Deposing Richard Babcock, Roy Gallagher, and Larry Nyhan. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (JOwe)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 327 [ENTERED ON WRONG DOCKET] JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff against Defendant Correctional Medical Services Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (JOwe) (Main Document 327 replaced on 8/8/2012) (JOwe). Modified on 8/8/2012 (JOwe).
August 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 321 MEMORANDUM and ORDER denying 267 Defendants'/Counter-Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery on Counts II and III. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (JOwe)
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 319 MEMORANDUM and ORDER denying 269 Proposed Defendant PIM Management's Company's Motion to Intervene Under Rule 24. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (JOwe)
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER DENYING Defendant's 244 Motion to Amend Their Affirmative Defenses. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MWil)
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 252 AMENDMENT to 217 Pretrial Order. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (JOwe)
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 220 MODIFICATION to 217 Pretrial Order Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (JOwe)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 214 MEMORANDUM Denying 191 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count 1 and on Defendants' Counterclaim. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (JOwe)
December 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER denying 191 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (JOwe)
November 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 207 MEMORANDUM and ORDER granting in part and denying in part 200 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Testimony. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (JOwe)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER Regarding Pending Discovery Matters. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (JOwe)
July 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting plaintiff's motion to strike defendants' jury demand 44 . Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (LSau)
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM and ORDER granting 21 Defendants' Motion for Leave to Amend Answer; denying without prejudice 23 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying without prejudice 25 Defendants' Motion to Compel; finding as moot 26 Defendants' Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (JOwe)
February 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 AMENDED MEMORANDUM and ORDER re 18 Memorandum and Order Denying Defendants' Amended Motion for Judgment on the Peladings as to Count 1 Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (JOwe)
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM and ORDER denying 12 Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Count 1. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (JOwe)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. v. Winget et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: William T. Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry J Winget
Represented By: John E. Anding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry J Winget Living Trust
Represented By: John E. Anding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?