McCandless v. Countrywide Financial, Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Sandra McCandless
Defendant: Countrywide Financial, Incorporated and Standard Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2008cv14195
Filed: September 30, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Oakland
Presiding Judge: Battani
Presiding Judge: Pepe
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1104 Recovery of Benefits to Employee
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 176 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS 169 MOTION TO ASSESS ATTORNEY FEES AND TAX COSTS, DENYING PLAINTIFFS 172 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, AND DISMISSING THE ACTION. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (KDoa)
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 168 AMENDED OPINION AND ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD AND REMANDING THE CASE TO THE PLAN ADMINISTRATOR - Plan Administrator render its decision within 90 days. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (KDoa)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 167 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD AND REMANDING THE CASE TO THE PLAN ADMINISTRATOR. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (KDoa)
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 134 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (MWil)
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 114 OPINION AND ORDER denying 102 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 105 Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record. Signed by District Judge Marianne O Battani. (BThe)
October 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting 55 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (GWil)
August 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER denying 39 Motion for Relief from Order.. Signed by District Judge Marianne O Battani. (BThe)
June 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 OPINION AND ORDER granting 18 Motion to Dismiss Counts II, III, & IV.. Signed by District Judge Marianne O Battani. (BThe)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCandless v. Countrywide Financial, Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra McCandless
Represented By: Richard J. Dimanin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Financial, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?