TDC International Corporation v. Burnham

Plaintiff: TDC International Corporation
Defendant: Jae L. Burnham
Case Number: 2:2008cv14792
Filed: November 14, 2008
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Cleland
Referring Judge: Majzoub
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2017 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE pending the outcome of Defendant's Chapter 7 Bankruptcy filed in the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Western District of Michigan on July 10, 2017; CANCELLING the July 12, 2017 Show Cause Hearing and DIRECTING Plaintiff to update the court as to the bankruptcy proceedings every 90 days. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
January 5, 2011 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE with attached copy of Notice of Bankruptcy Filing of defendant Jae Burnham. Signed by District Judge Robert H Cleland. (LWag)
November 19, 2010 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER holding defendant Jae Burnham in Contempt of Court and imposing civil penalites {see order for details) Signed by District Judge Robert H Cleland. (LWag)
November 2, 2010 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 55 Renewed MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by TDC International Corporation., AND ORDER for Jae L. Burnham to Show Cause why defendant should not be held in contempt of court and sanctioned for failing to abide by the Settlement Agreement, Consent Judgment and the Injunction.( Hearing set for 11/10/2010 03:00 PM before District Judge Robert H Cleland) Signed by District Judge Robert H Cleland. (LWag)
May 3, 2010 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that defendant shall pay to plaintiff $10,178.00, payable of at least $100.00 per week; that the defendant shall remove and delete all of his internet postings, advertisements, websites, email addresses, online business listings, YouT ube accounts, Twitter accounts, Craiglist postings and any other online material associated with him and is directed to file with the court by May 11, 2010 proof sufficient for the court to determine that he has removed his entire presence from the internet. (see order for further details) Signed by District Judge Robert H Cleland. (LWag)
March 3, 2010 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER HOLDING Defendant in Contempt, Directing Defendant to Pay Penalty and Fees, and Setting Additional Show Cause Hearing for April 6, 2010 at 11:00 a.m. Signed by District Judge Robert H Cleland. (Goltz, D)
January 21, 2010 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 31 Plaintiff's "Motion to Enforce Judgment," Ordering Defendant to Show Cause Why He Should Not be Held in Contempt filed by TDC International Corporation (Hearing set for 2/24/2010 @ 2:00 PM before District Judge Robert H Cleland). Signed by District Judge Robert H Cleland. (Goltz, D)
December 11, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 32 MOTION to Withdraw As Counsel For Jae L. Burnham d/b/a Quick And Easy Moving and Quick And Easy Moving, LLC filed by Jae L. Burnham; DEEMING Defendant to be proceeding pro se, and Set Deadlines as to 31 MOTION to Enforce Judgment and for Order to Show Cause :( Responses due by 12/28/2009) Signed by District Judge Robert H Cleland. (LWag)
February 20, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Robert H Cleland denying Plaintiff's 9 Motion for Default Judgment and granting Defendant's 11 Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default. (Ware, L.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TDC International Corporation v. Burnham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TDC International Corporation
Represented By: Arnold S. Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jae L. Burnham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?