Fialka-Feldman v. Oakland University Board of Trustees Featured Case
Plaintiff: Micah Fialka-Feldman
Defendant: Oakland University Board of Trustees
Case Number: 2:2008cv14922
Filed: November 25, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Oakland
Presiding Judge: Duggan
Presiding Judge: Morgan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42:405 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 NOTICE re 57 MOTION for Attorney Fees, WILL BE DECIDED WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT (MOre)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 AFFIDAVIT of Chris E. Davis re 63 Reply to Response to Motion for Attorney Fees by Micah Fialka-Feldman (Davis, Chris)
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 SUR-REPLY re 57 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Oakland University Board of Trustees, Gary D Russi, Mary Beth Snyder, Lionel Maten. (Boonin, Robert)
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 REPLY to Response re 57 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Micah Fialka-Feldman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Time/Billable Hours Data Report) (Rao, Veena)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 RESPONSE to 57 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Oakland University Board of Trustees, Gary D Russi, Mary Beth Snyder, Lionel Maten. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1) Childress v. Williams, # 3 Exhibit 2-1) 2007 State Bar of Michigan: 2007 Economics of Law Practice in Michgian, # 4 Exhibit 2-2) 2007 State Bar of Michigan: 2007 Economics of Law Practice in Michigan, # 5 Exhibit 2-3) 2007 State Bar of Michigan: 2007 Economics of Law Practice in Michigan, # 6 Exhibit 3) Time Entries Lacking Time Entry Notes, # 7 Exhibit 4) Time Entries with Insufficient Time Entry Notes, # 8 Exhibit 5) Internal MPAS Meetings, # 9 Exhibit 6) Sykes v. Anderson, # 10 Exhibit 7) Excessive Coverage at Depositions, # 11 Exhibit 8) Gabrielle Frampton Travel Time, # 12 Exhibit 9) Chris Davis Travel Time, # 13 Exhibit 10) Chris Davis Lexis and Westlaw Research Charges, # 14 Exhibit 11) Chris Davis "Filing, Faxing, File/Records Organizing" Charges, # 15 Exhibit 12) Chris Davis Attendance at OU Board of Trustees Meetings, # 16 Exhibit 13) Mark Cody Time Entries, # 17 Exhibit 14) Veena Rao Time Entries, # 18 Exhibit 15) Joshua Kay Time Entries, # 19 Exhibit 16) All Attorneys Pre-Litigation Time Entries, # 20 Exhibit 17) New Life Ministries v. Charter Twp. of Mt. Morris, # 21 Exhibit 18) Fees Associated with Motion for Preliminary Injunction) (Boonin, Robert)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Notice of Filing Transcript. (Matthews, N)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 TRANSCRIPT of HEARING ON MOTIONS held on December 17, 2009. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Nefertiti Jodi Matthews) (Number of Pages: 59) (Appeal Purposes) Redaction Request due 2/24/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/8/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/4/2010. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through WWW.TRANSCRIPTORDERS.COM before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Matthews, N)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Court Reporter Acknowledgment of Transcript Order Form received on January 20, 2010. Transcript for court proceeding held on: December 17, 2009. Estimated transcript completion date: February 20, 2010. Estimated number of pages: 49. Payment arrangements were made on January 20, 2010. (Matthews, N)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 COSTS TAXED in amount of $2,767.40 against defendants. (DPer)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 BILL OF COSTS by Micah Fialka-Feldman (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A - Fees of the Clerk, # 3 Exhibit B - Court Reporter Fees) (Davis, Chris)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Micah Fialka-Feldman. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Christine Riddle, # 3 Exhibit B - Time/Billable Hours Data Report, # 4 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Mark Cody, # 5 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Chris E. Davis, # 6 Exhibit E - Affidavit of Veena Rao, # 7 Exhibit F - Affidavit of Joshua B. Kay, # 8 Exhibit G - Kramer v. Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, # 9 Index of Exhibits H - Grain v. Trinity Health) (Davis, Chris)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Certificate of Service re 55 Notice of Appeal. (TMcg)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Oakland University Board of Trustees, Gary D Russi, Mary Beth Snyder, Lionel Maten re 53 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion to Substitute Party,,,, Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction, 54 Judgment. Receipt No: 06450000000002311986 - Fee: $ 455 - Fee Status: Fee Paid. (Boonin, Robert)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff against Defendants Signed by District Judge Patrick J Duggan. (MOre)
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 53 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 37 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 39 Motion to Substitute Party. ; granting in part and denying in part 39 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 39 Motion for Permanent Injunction. Signed by District Judge Patrick J Duggan. (MOre)
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re 39 MOTION to Substitute Party MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Permanent Injunction Supplemental Submission to Plaintiff's Reply Brief filed by Oakland University Board of Trustees, Gary D Russi, Mary Beth Snyder, Lionel Maten. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1. Affidavit of Theresa M. Rowe, # 3 Exhibit 2. Affidavit of Mary Beth Snyder, # 4 Exhibit 3. Excerpts of U.S. Department of Homeland Security) (Boonin, Robert)
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Minute Entry - Motion Hearing held on 12/17/2009 re 39 MOTION to Substitute Party MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Micah Fialka-Feldman, 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Mary Beth Snyder, Gary D Russi, Lionel Maten, Oakland University Board of Trustees before District Judge Patrick J Duggan. Disposition: Taken Under Advisement(Court Reporter Jodi Matthews) (MOre)
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 51 SUR-REPLY re 39 MOTION to Substitute Party MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Supplemental Submission filed by Oakland University Board of Trustees, Gary D Russi, Mary Beth Snyder, Lionel Maten. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Expert Report) (Boonin, Robert)
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Mark A. Cody appearing on behalf of Micah Fialka-Feldman (Cody, Mark)
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 REPLY to Response re 39 MOTION to Substitute Party MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Micah Fialka-Feldman. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Howell Affidavit, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Howell Dorm Living Email, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Email from Wiggins, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Process for Hall Contracts, # 6 Exhibit 5 - Micah Housing Contract, # 7 Exhibit 6 - Cikis Affidavit, # 8 Exhibit 7 - Peterson Report, # 9 Exhibit 8 - Bertrand Affidavit, # 10 Exhibit 9 - Sterner Affidavit, # 11 Exhibit 10 - Beamon Affidavit, # 12 Exhibit 11 - GAO Report (Excerpts), # 13 Exhibit 12 - Maten Deposition Excerpts) (Davis, Chris)
December 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 REPLY to Response re 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Oakland University Board of Trustees, Gary D Russi, Mary Beth Snyder, Lionel Maten. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1) Deposition of Plaintiff, # 3 Exhibit 2) Transcript of Board of Trustees Meeting, # 4 Exhibit 3) 11/7/08, Letter from Oakland University to Plaintiff Counsel, # 5 Exhibit 4) 11/17/08 Letter from Oakland University to Plaintiff Counsel, # 6 Exhibit 5) Deposition of Mary Beth Snyder, # 7 Exhibit 6) Affidavit of Lionel Maten, # 8 Exhibit 7) Affidavit of C. Michelle Piskulich) (Boonin, Robert)
December 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Gabrielle S. Frampton by Micah Fialka-Feldman. (Davis, Chris)
December 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Notice of Failure to Comply with ECF Policies and Procedures as to attorney Gabrielle S. Frampton. Bounced NEF for 45 Response to Motion,,,,,,. (TMcg)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 RESPONSE to 39 MOTION to Substitute Party MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Permanent Injunction Defendants' Amended Response to Plaitniff's Motion for Substitution of Defendant, Summary Judgment and Permanent Injunction filed by Oakland University Board of Trustees, Gary D Russi, Mary Beth Snyder, Lionel Maten. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1. Deposition of Mary Beth Snyder, # 3 Exhibit 2. Affidavit of Deborah Middlebrook, # 4 Exhibit 3. Affidavit of Linda Sisson, # 5 Exhibit 4. Stewart v. Barnhart, 2005 WL 3088543 (W.D. KY.Nov. 14, 2005), # 6 Exhibit 5. Contract for Residence Hall Services 2007-08, # 7 Exhibit 6. Deposition of Lionel Maten, # 8 Exhibit 7. IPEDS Report, # 9 Exhibit 8. 2009-10 NCES Survey Material: FAQ, # 10 Exhibit 9. FISAP Report, # 11 Exhibit 10. FISAP Instructions, # 12 Exhibit 11. Affidavit of Mary Beth Snyder, 11/13/2009, # 13 Exhibit 12. Deposition of Janice Fialka, # 14 Exhibit 13. Deposition of Plaintiff, # 15 Exhibit 14. Deposition of Robert Wiggins, # 16 Index of Exhibits 15. Divito v. Oakland University, # 17 Exhibit 16. March 19, 2007 Proposal, # 18 Exhibit MORC Record of PCP, # 19 Exhibit 18. Provost Memo, # 20 Exhibit 19. Wiggins' E-mail to Feldman, # 21 Exhibit 20. Affidavit of Roxanne Fisher, # 22 Exhibit 21. Transcript of Board of Trustees Meeting, # 23 Exhibit 22. Sutton v. Piper, 2009 U.S. App. LEXIS 17201 (6th Cir. July 30, 2009), # 24 Exhibit 23. Affidavit of Mary Beth Snyder, 1/5/2009) (Boonin, Robert)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Notice of Failure to Comply with ECF Policies and Procedures as to attorney Gabrielle S. Frampton. (TMcg)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 RESPONSE to 39 MOTION to Substitute Party MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Oakland University Board of Trustees, Gary D Russi, Mary Beth Snyder, Lionel Maten. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1) Deposition of Mary Beth Snyder, # 3 Exhibit 2) Affidavit of Deborah Middlebrook, # 4 Exhibit 3) Affidavit of Linda Sisson, # 5 Exhibit 4) Stewart v. Barnhart, # 6 Exhibit 5) Contract for Residence Hall Services 2007-08, # 7 Exhibit 6) Deposition of Lionel Maten, # 8 Exhibit 7) IPEDS Report, # 9 Exhibit 8) 2009-10 NCES Survey Material: FAQ, # 10 Exhibit 9) FISAP Report, # 11 Exhibit 10) FISAP Instructions, # 12 Exhibit 11) Affidavit of Mary Beth Snyder, 11/13/2009, # 13 Exhibit 12) Deposition of Janice Fialka, # 14 Exhibit 13) Deposition of Plaintiff, # 15 Exhibit 14) Deposition of Robert Wiggins, # 16 Exhibit 15) Divito v. Oakland University, # 17 Exhibit 16) March 19, 2007 Proposal, # 18 Exhibit 17) MORC Record of PCP, # 19 Exhibit 18) Provost Memo, # 20 Exhibit 19) Wiggins' E-mail to Feldman, # 21 Exhibit 20) Affidavit of Roxanne Fisher, # 22 Exhibit 21) Transcript of Board of Trustees Meeting, # 23 Exhibit 22) Sutton v. Piper, # 24 Exhibit 23) Affidavit of Mary Beth Snyder, 1/5/2009) (Boonin, Robert)
December 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 RESPONSE to 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Micah Fialka-Feldman. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A - Oakland University Housing Advertisement, # 3 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Teresa K. Nkenge Zola Beamon, # 4 Exhibit C - Oakland University Housing Contract, 2009-10, # 5 Exhibit D - Mary Beth Snyder Deposition Excerpts, # 6 Exhibit E - Lionel Maten Deposition Excerpts, # 7 Exhibit F - Richard Feldman Deposition Excerpts, # 8 Exhibit G - Micah Fialka-Feldman Deposition Excerpt) (Davis, Chris)
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER ESTABLISHING TRIAL DOCKET FOR JANUARY/FEBRUARY, 2010. Signed by District Judge Patrick J Duggan. (MOre)
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE of hearing on 39 MOTION to Substitute Party MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Permanent Injunction, 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2009 02:45 PM before District Judge Patrick J Duggan. (MOre)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION to Substitute Party, MOTION for Summary Judgment, MOTION for Permanent Injunction by Micah Fialka-Feldman. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Letter to Kim Dembrosky from Dr. Howard Schubiner, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Micah Fialka-Feldman, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Proposal to Establish a Continuing Education Program, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Letter from Robert Wiggins, # 6 Exhibit 5 - E-mail from Kim Dembrosky, # 7 Exhibit 6 - OPTIONS Program Brochure, # 8 Exhibit 7 - Contract for Residence Halls Services, 2007-08, # 9 Exhibit 8 - E-mail from Bob Wiggins to Rick Feldman and Kim Dembrosky, # 10 Exhibit 9 - E-mails from Bob Wiggins to Rick Feldman Dated 11/29/07 and 1/10/08, # 11 Exhibit 10 - E-mail to Rick Feldman from Roxanne Fisher, # 12 Exhibit 11 - Letter to Micah Fialka-Feldman from Lionel Maten, # 13 Exhibit 12 - Oakland University Account Status for Micah Fialka-Feldman, # 14 Exhibit 13 - Oakland University Residence Halls Contract Release Request, 3/6/08 Version, # 15 Exhibit 14 - Letter to Micah Fialka-Feldman from Mary Beth Snyder Dated 5/23/08, # 16 Exhibit 15 - Affidavit of Sharon Howell, # 17 Exhibit 16 - Oakland University Board of Trustees Meeting Minutes from 9/17/08, # 18 Exhibit 17 - Letter to Micah Fialka-Feldman from Mary Beth Snyder Dated 9/24/08, # 19 Exhibit 18 - Letter to Victor Zambardi from Chris Davis Dated 10/7/08, # 20 Exhibit 19 - Mary Beth Snyder Statement to Board of Trustees on 11/5/08, # 21 Exhibit 20 - Letter to Chris Davis from Victor Zambardi Dated 11/7/08, # 22 Exhibit 21 - Letter to Victor Zambardi from Chris Davis Dated 11/14/08, # 23 Exhibit 22 - Letter to Chris Davis from Victor Zambardi Dated 11/17/08, # 24 Exhibit 23 - MORC Eligibility Determination Documentation, # 25 Exhibit 24 - Transition Individualized Education Program Team Report Dated 6/20/08, # 26 Exhibit 25 - Affidavit of Nicole Bertrand, # 27 Exhibit 26 - Affidavit of Heather Sterner, # 28 Exhibit 27 - Oakland University Student ID Card and Personal Profile for Micah Fialka-Feldman, # 29 Exhibit 28 - Oakland University Reading-Writing Clinic Final Report, # 30 Exhibit 29 - Oakland University Housing Web Page, # 31 Exhibit 30 - Oakland University Housing Web Page: What Students Are Saying, # 32 Exhibit 31 - Robert Wiggins Deposition Excerpts, # 33 Exhibit 32 - Mary Beth Snyder Deposition Excerpts, # 34 Exhibit 33 - Lionel Maten Deposition Excerpts, # 35 Exhibit 34 - Micah Fialka-Feldman Deposition Excerpts, # 36 Exhibit 35 - Richard Feldman Deposition Excerpts, # 37 Exhibit 36 - Janice Fialka Deposition Excerpts) (Davis, Chris)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE REGARDING MOTION PRACTICE (MOre)
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Oakland University Board of Trustees, Gary D Russi, Mary Beth Snyder, Lionel Maten. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1. Deposition of Robert Wiggins, # 3 Exhibit 2. March 19, 2007 Proposal, # 4 Exhibit 3. Deposition of Janice Fialka, # 5 Exhibit 4. Deposition of Lionel Maten, # 6 Exhibit 5. IPEDS Report, # 7 Exhibit 6. Deposition of Mary Beth Snyder, # 8 Exhibit 7. Affidavit of Roxanne Fisher, # 9 Exhibit 8. Email from Feldman to Fisher, # 10 Exhibit 9. Letter from Maten to Plaintiff, # 11 Exhibit 10. Affidavit of Lionel Maten, # 12 Exhibit 11. Contract for Residence Hall Services 2008-09, # 13 Exhibit 12. Contract for Residence Hall Services 2007-08, # 14 Exhibit 13. Affidavit of Linda Sisson, # 15 Exhibit 14. 2009-10 NCES Survey Material: FAQ, # 16 Exhibit 15. FISAP Report, # 17 Exhibit 16. FISAP Instructions, # 18 Exhibit 17. Sutton v Piper, 2009 U.S. App. LEXIS 17201 (6th Cir. July 30, 2009), # 19 Exhibit 18. Stewart v Barnhart, 2005 WL 3088543 (W.D. Ky. Nov. 14, 2005, # 20 Exhibit 19. Affidavit of Mary Beth Snyder, # 21 Exhibit 20. Provost Memos, # 22 Exhibit 21. IPEDS Glossary Excerpt) (Boonin, Robert)
October 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Defendant's First Amendment to WITNESS LIST by Oakland University Board of Trustees, Gary D Russi, Mary Beth Snyder (Boonin, Robert) Modified on 10/14/2009 (DWor). [ADDED LIONEL MATEN AS A FILER]
October 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Veena Rao appearing on behalf of Micah Fialka-Feldman (Rao, Veena)
October 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by District Judge Patrick J Duggan. (MOre)
August 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 WITNESS LIST by Oakland University Board of Trustees, Gary D Russi, Mary Beth Snyder (Boonin, Robert)
July 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Regan K. Dahle appearing on behalf of Oakland University Board of Trustees, Gary D Russi, Mary Beth Snyder, Lionel Maten (Dahle, Regan)
July 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses Answer and Affirmative and Other Defenses to Second Amended Complaint by Oakland University Board of Trustees, Gary D Russi, Mary Beth Snyder, Lionel Maten. (Boonin, Robert)
June 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Micah Fialka-Feldman against Oakland University Board of Trustees, Gary D Russi, Mary Beth Snyder, Lionel Maten. (Davis, Chris)
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 OPINION AND ORDER granting 21 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by District Judge Patrick J Duggan. (MOre)
June 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/31/2009 Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 11/15/2009 Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/12/2010 02:45 PM, Trial set for January/February, 2010 before District Judge Patrick J Duggan Signed by District Judge Patrick J Duggan. (Refer to image for additional dates) (MOre)
June 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Minute Entry -Motion Hearing held on 6/16/2009 re 21 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Micah Fialka-Feldman, Scheduling Conference held on 6/16/2009 before District Judge Patrick J Duggan. Disposition: Motion Taken Under Advisement(Court Reporter Jodi Matthews) (MOre)
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE by Oakland University Board of Trustees, Gary D Russi, Mary Beth Snyder, Lionel Maten re 21 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint Notice of Recent Supplement Authority in Support of Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion (Boonin, Robert)
June 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to 21 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing Reset for 6/16/2009 02:00 PM before District Judge Patrick J Duggan (MOre)
June 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to 21 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing Reset for 6/18/2009 02:00 PM before District Judge Patrick J Duggan (MOre)
June 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of hearing on 21 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2009 02:15 PM before District Judge Patrick J Duggan. (MOre)
May 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 REPLY to Response re 21 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Micah Fialka-Feldman. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Rick Feldman, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Micah Fialka-Feldman, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Letter from Chris Davis to Robert Boonin Dated 4/6/09, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Letter from Robert Boonin to Chris Davis Dated 4/8/09, # 6 Exhibit 5 - Oakland University Contract for Residence Halls Services, 2007-08, # 7 Exhibit 6 - Letter from Lionel Maten to Micah Fialka-Feldman Dated 11/28/07) (Davis, Chris)
May 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RESPONSE to 21 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Oakland University Board of Trustees, Gary D Russi, Mary Beth Snyder. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Maten Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit Term Definitions) (Boonin, Robert)
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER re 19 Amended Document Signed by District Judge Patrick J Duggan. (MOre)
May 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Gary D Russi served on 5/1/2009, answer due 5/21/2009; Mary Beth Snyder served on 5/1/2009, answer due 5/21/2009; Lionel Maten served on 5/1/2009, answer due 5/21/2009. (Davis, Chris)
April 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Micah Fialka-Feldman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint) (Davis, Chris)
April 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SUMMONS Issued for *Gary D Russi, Mary Beth Snyder, Lionel Maten* (DHam)
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order REQUEST for SUMMONS for Gary D Russi, Mary Beth Snyder, Lionel Maten. (Davis, Chris)
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AMENDED by Micah Fialka-Feldman First Amended Complaint (Davis, Chris) Modified on 4/24/2009 (CGre). [WRONG EVENT USED]
April 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 13 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by District Judge Patrick J Duggan. (MOre)
April 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE re 13 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint - Adding Defendants, TO BE DECIDED WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT (MOre)
March 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPLY to Response re 13 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint - Adding Defendants filed by Micah Fialka-Feldman. (Davis, Chris)
March 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE to 13 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint - Adding Defendants filed by Oakland University Board of Trustees. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit Ex 1 - Patmon Opinion, # 3 Exhibit Ex 2 - Social Aid Opinion) (Boonin, Robert)
March 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Micah Fialka-Feldman re 13 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint - Adding Defendants (Davis, Chris)
February 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint - Adding Defendants by Micah Fialka-Feldman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint) (Davis, Chris)
February 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 OPINION AND ORDER denying 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting 4 Motion to Expedite. Signed by District Judge Patrick J Duggan. (MOre)
January 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Minute Entry -Motion Hearing held on 1/13/2009 re 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite filed by Micah Fialka-Feldman before District Judge Patrick J Duggan. Disposition: Taken Under Advisement(Court Reporter Jodi Matthews) (MOre)
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REQUEST to File Supplemental Exhibits by Micah Fialka-Feldman. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Rick Feldman, # 3 Exhibit 2 - First Amended Complaint) (Davis, Chris)
January 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REPLY to Response re 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite filed by Micah Fialka-Feldman. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Oakland University Housing Contract, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Oakland University Housing Student Handbook, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Amended Complaint) (Davis, Chris)
January 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gabrielle S. Frampton appearing on behalf of Micah Fialka-Feldman (Frampton, Gabrielle)
January 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RESPONSE to 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite filed by Oakland University Board of Trustees. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A. Affidavit of Mary Beth Snyder, # 3 Exhibit B. Affidavit of Lionel Maten, # 4 Exhibit C. Winter v Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., # 5 Index of Exhibits D. Honeywell Inc. v Brewer Garrett Co., # 6 Exhibit E. Morris v Dehaan, # 7 Exhibit F. The Oakland Sail v Oakland Univs. Bd. of Trustees, # 8 Exhibit G. Underfer v Univ. of Toledo, # 9 Exhibit H. Johnson-Brown v Wayne State University, # 10 Exhibit I. Kalai v State of Hawaii Dept. of Human Services, # 11 Exhibit J. Kuchmas v Townson Univ.) (Boonin, Robert)
December 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of hearing on 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite. Motion Hearing set for 1/13/2009 02:15 PM before District Judge Patrick J Duggan. (MOre)
December 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE REGARDING MOTION PRACTICE (MOre)
December 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Other Defenses by Oakland University Board of Trustees. (Boonin, Robert)
December 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION to Expedite by Micah Fialka-Feldman. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Micah Fialka-Feldman, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Oakland University OPTIONS Brochure, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Oakland University Account Status for Micah Fialka-Feldman, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Student Identification Card and Personal Profile for Micah, # 6 Exhibit 5 - E-mail from Roxanne Fisher to Rick Feldman Dated 11/14/07, # 7 Exhibit 6 - E-mail from Robert A. Wiggins Dated 11/29/07, # 8 Exhibit 7 - Student Account Refund Check Statement, # 9 Exhibit 8 - Letter from Mary Beth Snyder to Micah Fialka-Feldman Dated 5/23/08, # 10 Exhibit 9 - Letter from Mary Beth Snyder to Micah Fialka-Feldman Dated 9/24/08, # 11 Exhibit 10 - Letter from Chris Davis to Victor Zambardi Dated 10/7/08, # 12 Exhibit 11 - Letter from Victor Zambardi to Chris Davis Dated 11/7/08, # 13 Exhibit 12 - Letter from Chris Davis to Victor Zambardi Dated 11/14//08, # 14 Exhibit 13 - Letter from Victor Zambardi to Chris Davis Dated 11/17/08, # 15 Exhibit 14 - Oakland University Housing Advertisement, # 16 Exhibit 15 - Affidavit of Richard Bernstein) (Davis, Chris)
December 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Oakland University Board of Trustees served on 12/1/2008, answer due 12/22/2008. (Davis, Chris)
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Oakland University Board of Trustees* (SSch)
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Micah Fialka-Feldman against Oakland University Board of Trustees with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 06450000000001780572 - Fee: $ 350. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Davis, Chris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fialka-Feldman v. Oakland University Board of Trustees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micah Fialka-Feldman
Represented By: Chris E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakland University Board of Trustees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?