CNH America LLC v. International Union United Auto Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America
Plaintiff: CNH America LLC
Defendant: International Union United Auto Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America
Case Number: 2:2009cv10584
Filed: February 17, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Duggan
Presiding Judge: Scheer
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 JUDGMENT Signed by District Judge Patrick J Duggan. (MOre)
April 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 OPINION AND ORDER denying 12 Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by District Judge Patrick J Duggan. (MOre)
February 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting 5 Motion to Reassign Case.. Signed by District Judge Patrick J Duggan. (MOre)
February 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Rudolph T Randa on 02/12/2009 granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; granting 8 Motion to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan; granting 17 Motion to Supplement. (cc: all counsel) (Koll, J) [Transferred from wied on 2/17/2009.] Modified on 2/17/2009 (SSro).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CNH America LLC v. International Union United Auto Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Union United Auto Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America
Represented By: Julia Penny Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CNH America LLC
Represented By: Norman C. Ankers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?