Weather Underground, Incorporated v. Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated et al Featured Case

Plaintiff The Weather Underground, Inc. alleges Defendants Navigation Catalyst Systems Inc., Basic Fusion Inc., Connexus Corporation, and Firstlook Inc. used an automated process to register and use domain names that are confusingly similar to famous or distinctive trademarks owned by the Plaintiff.

Plaintiff: Weather Underground, Incorporated
Defendant: Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated, Basic Fusion, Incorporated, Connexus Corporation and Firstlook, Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2009cv10756
Filed: February 27, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Washtenaw
Presiding Judge: Battani
Presiding Judge: Morgan
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2012 Filing 301 Trademark Report Sent To Washington (PMil)
June 15, 2012 Filing 300 JUDGMENT in favor of THE EPIC MEDIA GROUP, INC. against WEATHER UNDERGROUND, INC., on the claims in Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (BThe)
June 15, 2012 Filing 299 JUDGMENT in favor of WEATHER UNDERGROUND, INC. against DEFENDANTS. Judgment in the amount of $ 3,500,000.00. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (BThe)
June 13, 2012 Minute Entry - Telephone Conference held on 6/13/2012 before District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (Court Reporter Robert L. Smith) (CMot)
June 13, 2012 Filing 298 TRANSCRIPT of Settlement held on May 30, 2012. (Court Reporter: Robert L. Smith - 313.964.3303) (Number of Pages: 16) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 7/5/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/16/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/11/2012. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Smith, R.)
May 29, 2012 Filing 297 TRIAL BRIEF by Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated (Delgado, William)
May 29, 2012 Filing 296 Proposed Jury Instructions by Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated (Delgado, William)
May 25, 2012 Filing 295 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re 242 MOTION in Limine No. 3 filed by Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Delgado, William)
May 25, 2012 Filing 294 STATEMENT of Objections to Plaitniff's Designations of Deposition Transcript of Lily Stevenson by Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated (Delgado, William)
May 25, 2012 NOTICE of Error directed to: William A Delgado re 291 Statement, 292 Statement. Document is prohibited discovery, disclosure or a certificate of service thereof. Document was stricken. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (KKra)
May 25, 2012 Filing 293 MEMORANDUM of remaining evidentiary issues prior to trial by Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated (Delgado, William)
May 25, 2012 Filing 292 [STRICKEN] STATEMENT of Defendants' Objections to Plaintiff's Designations of Deposition Transcript of Seth Jacoby by Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated (Delgado, William) Modified on 5/25/2012 (KKra).
May 25, 2012 Filing 291 [STRICKEN] STATEMENT of Defendants' Objections to Plaintiff's Designations of Deposition Transcript of Chris Pirrone by Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated (Delgado, William) Modified on 5/25/2012 (KKra).
May 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER denying 282 Motion to Compel; denying 283 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (BThe)
May 16, 2012 Minute Entry - Motion Hearing held via Telephone Conference on 5/16/2012 re 282 Emergency MOTION to Compel Production of Asset Transfer Documentation filed by Weather Underground, Incorporated, 283 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney William Delgado, etal filed by Epic Media Group, Incorporated etal,before District Judge Marianne O. Battani. Disposition: Denied(Court Reporter Robert L. Smith) (CMot)
May 15, 2012 Filing 289 REPLY to Response re 282 Emergency MOTION to Compel Production of Asset Transfer Documentation filed by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Patti, Anthony)
May 15, 2012 Filing 288 DECLARATION by William A. Delgado re 287 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by All Defendants (Delgado, William)
May 15, 2012 Filing 287 REPLY to Response re 283 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney William Delgado, Bruce Sendek, Benjamin Steffans, Nicholas Stasevich filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E) (Delgado, William)
May 14, 2012 Filing 286 RESPONSE to 283 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney William Delgado, Bruce Sendek, Benjamin Steffans, Nicholas Stasevich filed by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Schaefer, Enrico)
May 14, 2012 Filing 285 RESPONSE to 282 Emergency MOTION to Compel Production of Asset Transfer Documentation filed by Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Delgado, William)
May 9, 2012 Filing 284 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on February 28, 2012. (Court Reporter: Robert L. Smith - 313.964.3303) (Number of Pages: 64) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 5/30/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/11/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/7/2012. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Smith, R.)
May 9, 2012 Set Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 5/16/2012 10:00 AM before District Judge Marianne O. Battani (CMot)
May 7, 2012 Filing 283 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney William Delgado, Bruce Sendek, Benjamin Steffans, Nicholas Stasevich by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Delgado Declaration) (Delgado, William)
May 4, 2012 Filing 282 Emergency MOTION to Compel Production of Asset Transfer Documentation by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Seth Jacoby in Support of Motion to Quash, # 2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Seth Jacoby in Further Support of Motion to Quash, # 3 Exhibit C - April 10, 2012 New York Hearing Transcript, # 4 Exhibit D - Excerpts from Seth Jacobys April 12, 2012 Deposition Transcript, # 5 Exhibit E - New York Order Denying Motion to Quash the Subpoena, # 6 Exhibit F - Ryaianir Domain Summary, Dep. Ex. P5.230A, # 7 Exhibit G - Ryaneair Domain Summary, Dep. Ex. P5.233A, # 8 Exhibit H - Ryanaair Domain Summary, Dep. Ex. P5.232A, # 9 Exhibit I - Phoitobucket Domain Summary, Dep. Ex. P5.65A(1), # 10 Exhibit J - Humgryhowies Domain Summary, Dep. Ex. P5.45A(1), # 11 Exhibit K - Wanyestate Domain Summary, Dep. Ex. P5.91A) (Patti, Anthony)
May 3, 2012 Filing 281 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by William A Delgado on behalf of Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Delgado, William)
March 23, 2012 Filing 280 TRANSCRIPT of Excerpt of Motion for Protective Order held on February 28, 2012. (Court Reporter: Robert L. Smith) (Number of Pages: 16) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 4/13/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2012. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Smith, R.)
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 279 AMENDED TRIAL MANAGEMENT ORDER: Jury Trial reset for 5/29/2012 09:00 AM before District Judge Marianne O. Battani Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (BThe)
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER granting 271 Motion Continue Trial Date. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (CMot)
March 7, 2012 Minute Entry - Telephone Conference Re Motion to Continue Trial held on 3/7/2012 before District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (CMot)
March 6, 2012 Attorney J. Michael Huget is discontinued from receiving Notices of Electronic Filing. Reason: No longer representing these defendants. (Huget, J.)
March 5, 2012 Filing 277 ERRATA Sheet re: 272 Declaration, filed by Firstlook, Incorporated, Connexus Corporation, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. by Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated (Delgado, William)
March 5, 2012 Filing 276 DECLARATION by Richard Korf re 271 MOTION to continue trial date filed by Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated (Delgado, William)
March 5, 2012 Filing 275 SEALED EXHIBIT H re 272 Declaration, by Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Delgado, William)
March 5, 2012 Filing 274 DECLARATION by David Graff re 271 MOTION to continue trial date filed by Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G) (Delgado, William)
March 5, 2012 Filing 273 DECLARATION by Carlos A. Singer re 271 MOTION to continue trial date filed by Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E, # 2 Exhibit F) (Delgado, William)
March 5, 2012 Filing 272 DECLARATION by William A. Delgado re 271 MOTION to continue trial date filed by Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D) (Delgado, William)
March 5, 2012 Filing 271 MOTION to continue trial date by Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Delgado, William)
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER taking under advisement 236 Motion in Limine; denying 240 Motion in Limine; granting 241 Motion in Limine; denying without prejudice 242 Motion in Limine; taking under advisement 248 Motion in Limine; taking under advisement 250 Motion in Limine; denying 260 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (BThe)
February 28, 2012 Minute Entry - Motion Hearing held on 2/28/2012 re 240 MOTION in Limine No. 1 filed by Firstlook, Incorporated, Connexus Corporation, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated, 241 MOTION in Limine No. 2 filed by Firstlook, Incorporated, Connexus Corporation, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated, 239 MOTION in Limine to exclude testimony and portions of expert report of Defendants' Expert John Berryhill filed by Weather Underground, Incorporated, 250 MOTION in Limine No. 6 filed by Firstlook, Incorporated, Connexus Corporation, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated, 242 MOTION in Limine No. 3 filed by Firstlook, Incorporated, Connexus Corporation, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated, 245 MOTION in Limine to exclude testeimony and expert reports of Defendants' Expert Richard Korf filed by Weather Underground, Incorporated, 248 MOTION in Limine No. 5 filed by Firstlook, Incorporated, Connexus Corporation, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated, 260 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Firstlook, Incorporated, Connexus Corporation, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated, 238 SEALED MOTION Jury Instruction on Spoliation re 237 Declaration of Enrico Schaefer by Weather Underground, Incorporated.SEALED MOTION Jury Instruction on Spoliation re 237 Declaration of Enrico Schaefer by Weather Underground, Incorporated. filed by Weather Underground, Incorporated, 243 MOTION in Limine No. 4 filed by Firstlook, Incorporated, Connexus Corporation, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated, 236 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Discussion of Plaintiff's Actual Damages and of Defendants' Monetary Gain and Brief in Support filed by Weather Underground, Incorporated before District Judge Marianne O. Battani. Disposition: hearing held(Court Reporter Robert L. Smith) (CMot)
February 28, 2012 Filing 269 STATEMENT of Pretrial Conference Bench Book by Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated, Weather Underground, Incorporated (Attachments: # 1 Administrative Section, # 2 Exhibit Theory of the Case, # 3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Proposed Voir Dire, # 4 Exhibit Defendants' Proposed Voir Dire, # 5 Exhibit Witness List, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit List, # 7 Exhibit agreed Upon Jury Instructions, # 8 Exhibit Plaintiff's Additional Proposed Instructions, # 9 Exhibit Defendants' Additional Proposed Instructions, # 10 Exhibit Plaintiff's Proposed Verdict Form, # 11 Exhibit Defendants' Proposed Verdict Form, # 12 Exhibit Evidentiary Issues) (Delgado, William)
February 27, 2012 Filing 268 RESPONSE to 260 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I) (Schaefer, Enrico)
February 27, 2012 Filing 267 RESPONSE to 241 MOTION in Limine No. 2 filed by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Schaefer, Enrico)
February 27, 2012 Filing 266 RESPONSE to 250 MOTION in Limine No. 6 filed by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Patti, Anthony)
February 27, 2012 Filing 265 SEALED EXHIBIT A, B, C, and D re 264 Response to Motion by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D) (Schaefer, Enrico)
February 27, 2012 Filing 264 RESPONSE to 240 MOTION in Limine No. 1 filed by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E) (Schaefer, Enrico)
February 27, 2012 Filing 263 RESPONSE to 245 MOTION in Limine to exclude testeimony and expert reports of Defendants' Expert Richard Korf filed by Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Delgado, William)
February 27, 2012 Filing 262 RESPONSE to 239 MOTION in Limine to exclude testimony and portions of expert report of Defendants' Expert John Berryhill filed by Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Delgado, William)
February 27, 2012 Filing 261 DECLARATION by William A. Delgado re 260 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E) (Delgado, William)
February 27, 2012 Filing 260 MOTION for Protective Order by Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Delgado, William)
February 27, 2012 Filing 259 SEALED EXHIBIT A re 258 Response to Motion by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Schaefer, Enrico)
February 27, 2012 Filing 258 RESPONSE to 248 MOTION in Limine No. 5 filed by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Schaefer, Enrico)
February 27, 2012 Filing 257 SEALED EXHIBIT A re 256 Response to Motion by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Schaefer, Enrico)
February 27, 2012 Filing 256 RESPONSE to 242 MOTION in Limine No. 3 filed by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Schaefer, Enrico) Modified on 2/27/2012 (KKra). [DOCUMENT IS A RESPONSE TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5]
February 27, 2012 Filing 255 SEALED EXHIBIT A re 254 Response to Motion by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Schaefer, Enrico)
February 27, 2012 Filing 254 RESPONSE to 242 MOTION in Limine No. 3 filed by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Schaefer, Enrico)
February 24, 2012 Filing 253 RESPONSE to 238 SEALED MOTION Jury Instruction on Spoliation re 237 Declaration of Enrico Schaefer by Weather Underground, Incorporated.SEALED MOTION Jury Instruction on Spoliation re 237 Declaration of Enrico Schaefer by Weather Underground, Incorporated. filed by Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Delgado, William)
February 24, 2012 Filing 252 DECLARATION by Enrico Schaefer re 239 MOTION in Limine to exclude testimony and portions of expert report of Defendants' Expert John Berryhill, 245 MOTION in Limine to exclude testeimony and expert reports of Defendants' Expert Richard Korf filed by Weather Underground, Incorporated (Schaefer, Enrico)
February 24, 2012 Filing 251 RESPONSE to 236 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Discussion of Plaintiff's Actual Damages and of Defendants' Monetary Gain and Brief in Support filed by Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Delgado, William)
February 24, 2012 Filing 250 MOTION in Limine No. 6 by Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Delgado, William)
February 24, 2012 Filing 249 DECLARATION by William A. Delgado re 248 MOTION in Limine No. 5 filed by Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Delgado, William)
February 24, 2012 Filing 248 MOTION in Limine No. 5 by Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Delgado, William)
February 24, 2012 Filing 247 SEALED EXHIBIT A, B, and C re 245 MOTION in Limine to exclude testeimony and expert reports of Defendants' Expert Richard Korf by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C) (Schaefer, Enrico)
February 24, 2012 Filing 246 DECLARATION by William A. Delgado re 243 MOTION in Limine No. 4 filed by Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Delgado, William)
February 24, 2012 Filing 245 MOTION in Limine to exclude testeimony and expert reports of Defendants' Expert Richard Korf by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Schaefer, Enrico)
February 24, 2012 Filing 244 SEALED EXHIBIT A and B re 239 MOTION in Limine to exclude testimony and portions of expert report of Defendants' Expert John Berryhill by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit A) (Schaefer, Enrico)
February 24, 2012 Filing 243 MOTION in Limine No. 4 by Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Delgado, William)
February 24, 2012 Filing 242 MOTION in Limine No. 3 by Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Delgado, William)
February 24, 2012 Filing 241 MOTION in Limine No. 2 by Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Delgado, William)
February 24, 2012 Filing 240 MOTION in Limine No. 1 by Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Delgado, William)
February 24, 2012 Filing 239 MOTION in Limine to exclude testimony and portions of expert report of Defendants' Expert John Berryhill by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Schaefer, Enrico)
February 23, 2012 Filing 238 SEALED MOTION Jury Instruction on Spoliation re 237 Declaration of Enrico Schaefer by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Chart of Cease and Desist Letters, # 2 Exhibit B - Lily Stevenson Deposition Testimony, # 3 Exhibit C - Donnie Minsino Deposition Testimony, # 4 Exhibit D - William Delgado's Letter (Dep. Ex. No. 89), # 5 Exhibit E - Connexus Document Retention Policy (Dep. Ex. No. 100)) (Patti, Anthony)
February 23, 2012 Filing 237 DECLARATION by Enrico Schaefer, Esq. filed by Weather Underground, Incorporated (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Patti, Anthony)
February 23, 2012 Filing 236 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Discussion of Plaintiff's Actual Damages and of Defendants' Monetary Gain and Brief in Support by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Patti, Anthony)
February 23, 2012 NOTICE of Error directed to: Enrico Schaefer re 235 Certificate of Service. Document is prohibited discovery, disclosure or a certificate of service thereof. Document was stricken. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (KKra)
February 23, 2012 Filing 235 [STRICKEN] CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Weather Underground, Incorporated of Trial Deposition Testimony Subpoena (Schaefer, Enrico) Modified on 2/23/2012 (KKra).
February 17, 2012 Filing 234 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 02/11/2010. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Marie Metcalf) (Number of Pages: 14) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 3/9/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/19/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/17/2012. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Metcalf, M)
December 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 225 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (BThe)
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 232 OPINION AND ORDER denying 187 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 189 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (BThe)
November 3, 2011 Filing 231 REPLY to Response re 225 MOTION for Reconsideration re 222 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Order,, filed by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Schaefer, Enrico)
October 25, 2011 Filing 230 DECLARATION by William A. Delgado re 229 Response to Motion filed by Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Delgado, William)
October 25, 2011 Filing 229 RESPONSE to 225 MOTION for Reconsideration re 222 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Order,, filed by Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Delgado, William)
October 12, 2011 Filing 228 NOTICE of BRIEFING SCHEDULE on 225 MOTION for Reconsideration re 222 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Order, Responses due by 10/26/2011 Replies due by 11/3/2011; No hearing; decided on briefs. (CMot)
October 6, 2011 Filing 227 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce L. Sendek on behalf of Connexus Corporation, Epic Media Group, Incorporated, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Sendek, Bruce)
October 5, 2011 Filing 226 SEALED EXHIBIT B re 225 MOTION for Reconsideration re 222 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Order,, by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B - Part 2, # 2 Index of Exhibits B - Part 3) (Schaefer, Enrico)
October 5, 2011 Filing 225 MOTION for Reconsideration re 222 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Order,, by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Schaefer, Enrico)
October 3, 2011 Filing 224 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 09-15-2011. (Court Reporter: Robert L. Smith) (Number of Pages: 98) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 10/24/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/3/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/3/2012. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Smith, R.)
September 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 223 TRIAL MANAGEMENT ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference and Motion in Limine hearing set for 2/28/2012 02:00 PM; Jury Trial set for 3/12/2012 09:00 AM before District Judge Marianne O. Battani Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (BThe)
September 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER granting 178 Epic Media Group Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 202 Defendants' Connexus, Firstlook and Navigation Catalyst Systems, Inc. Motion for Order to Strike Report of Christopher Schwerzler and Prohibit his Testimony on same at trial. (Status conference set for 9/26/11 is Cancelled). Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (BThe)
September 15, 2011 Minute Entry - Motion Hearing held on 9/15/2011 re 178 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Epic Media Group, Incorporated, 202 MOTION for Order Excluding Expert Evidence and Testimony by Chris Schwerzler Pursuant to Daubert filed by Firstlook, Incorporated, Connexus Corporation, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated, 189 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Weather Underground, Incorporated, 187 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Firstlook, Incorporated, Connexus Corporation, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated before District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (Court Reporter Robert L. Smith) (CMot)
September 2, 2011 Filing 221 REPLY to Response re 202 MOTION for Order Excluding Expert Evidence and Testimony by Chris Schwerzler Pursuant to Daubert filed by Connexus Corporation, Epic Media Group, Incorporated, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Delgado, William)
September 1, 2011 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 9/26/2011 02:00 PM; Jury Trial set for 3/12/2012 09:00 AM before District Judge Marianne O. Battani (BThe)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER granting 206 Motion to Continue Pretrial Conference and Trial. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (BThe)
August 31, 2011 Minute Entry - Telephone Conference held on 8/31/2011 before District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (Court Reporter Robert Smith) (CMot)
August 30, 2011 Filing 219 REPLY to Response re 187 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Delgado, William)
August 30, 2011 Filing 218 RESPONSE to 202 MOTION for Order Excluding Expert Evidence and Testimony by Chris Schwerzler Pursuant to Daubert filed by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Schaefer, Enrico)
August 30, 2011 Filing 217 SEALED EXHIBIT TT - sent via FedEx re 216 Reply to Response to Motion, by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Schaefer, Enrico)
August 30, 2011 Filing 216 REPLY to Response re 189 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit OO, # 3 Exhibit PP, # 4 Exhibit QQ, # 5 Exhibit RR, # 6 Exhibit SS, # 7 Exhibit UU) (Schaefer, Enrico)
August 30, 2011 Filing 215 SEALED EXHIBIT re 214 Declaration by Epic Media Group, Incorporated. (Delgado, William)
August 30, 2011 Filing 214 DECLARATION by William A. Delgado re 211 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Epic Media Group, Incorporated (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit M, # 2 Exhibit N, # 3 Exhibit O, # 4 Exhibit P, # 5 Exhibit Q) (Delgado, William)
August 30, 2011 Filing 213 SEALED EXHIBIT L re 212 Declaration by Epic Media Group, Incorporated. (Delgado, William)
August 30, 2011 Filing 212 DECLARATION by David Graff re 211 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Epic Media Group, Incorporated (Delgado, William)
August 30, 2011 Filing 211 REPLY to Response re 178 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Epic Media Group, Incorporated. (Delgado, William)
August 29, 2011 Filing 210 MOTION for Summary Judgment (redacted copy of Dkt #205) by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Schaefer, Enrico) [FILING ERROR: DOCUMENT IS A RESONSE TO DE # 189] Modified on 8/29/2011 (DSmi).
August 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER to Remove Image and File Under Seal 205 Response to Motion, filed by Weather Underground, Incorporated. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (BSoc)
August 22, 2011 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 8/31/2011 11:00 AM before District Judge Marianne O. Battani (CMot)
August 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER to remove image and file under seal re 205 exhibits D through I, filed by Weather Underground, Incorporated. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (DWor)
August 16, 2011 Filing 207 NOTICE of hearing on 202 MOTION for Order Excluding Expert Evidence and Testimony by Chris Schwerzler Pursuant to Daubert. Responses due by 8/30/2011 Replies due by 9/8/2011 Motion Hearing set for 9/15/2011 02:30 PM before District Judge Marianne O. Battani (CMot)
August 16, 2011 Filing 206 MOTION to continue pretrial conference and trial date by Connexus Corporation, Epic Media Group, Incorporated, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Delgado, William)
August 15, 2011 Filing 205 RESPONSE to 189 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, (Schaefer, Enrico) Modified on 8/17/2011 (DWor). [EXHIBITS D THROUGH I ARE SEALED PURSUANT TO 208 ]
August 15, 2011 Filing 204 SEALED MOTION for Order Excluding Expert Evidence and Testimony by Chris Schwerzler Pursuant to Daubert re 202 MOTION for Order Excluding Expert Evidence and Testimony by Chris Schwerzler Pursuant to Daubert by Connexus Corporation, Epic Media Group, Incorporated, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit F, # 5 Exhibit G) (Delgado, William)
August 15, 2011 Filing 203 RESPONSE to 187 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Schaefer, Enrico)
August 15, 2011 Filing 202 MOTION for Order Excluding Expert Evidence and Testimony by Chris Schwerzler Pursuant to Daubert by Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G) (Delgado, William)
August 15, 2011 Filing 201 DECLARATION by William A. Delgado re 193 Response to Motion filed by Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit K, # 2 Exhibit L, # 3 Exhibit M, # 4 Exhibit N, # 5 Exhibit O, # 6 Exhibit P, # 7 Exhibit Q, # 8 Exhibit R, # 9 Exhibit S, # 10 Exhibit T, # 11 Exhibit U, # 12 Exhibit V, # 13 Exhibit W) (Delgado, William)
August 15, 2011 Filing 200 SEALED Exhibits F, G, H, I, and J to Misino Declaration re 199 Declaration, by Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F, # 2 Exhibit G, # 3 Exhibit H, # 4 Exhibit I, # 5 Exhibit J) (Delgado, William)
August 15, 2011 Filing 199 DECLARATION by Donnie Misino re 193 Response to Motion filed by Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E, # 2 Exhibit F, # 3 Exhibit G, # 4 Exhibit H, # 5 Exhibit I, # 6 Exhibit J) (Delgado, William)
August 15, 2011 Filing 198 SEALED EXHIBIT C to Llamas Declaration re 197 Declaration, 193 Response to Motion by Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Delgado, William)
August 15, 2011 Filing 197 DECLARATION by Mavi Llamas re 193 Response to Motion filed by Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C, # 2 Exhibit D) (Delgado, William)
August 15, 2011 Filing 196 SEALED Declaration of Richard Korf re 193 Response to Motion by Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B) (Delgado, William)
August 15, 2011 Filing 195 DECLARATION by John Berryhill re 193 Response to Motion filed by Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Delgado, William)
August 15, 2011 Filing 194 SEALED RESPONSE re 189 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,, (Unredacted Version) by Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Delgado, William)
August 15, 2011 Filing 193 RESPONSE to 189 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Redacted Version) filed by Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Delgado, William)
August 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER To Remove Image And File Under Seal. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (DWor)
July 19, 2011 Filing 191 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Connexus Corporation, Epic Media Group, Incorporated, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Delgado, William)
July 15, 2011 Filing 190 SEALED EXHIBIT re 189 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit J - Part 1, # 2 Exhibit J - Part 2, # 3 Exhibit J - Part 3, # 4 Exhibit J - Part 4, # 5 Exhibit J - Part 5, # 6 Exhibit K, # 7 Exhibit L, # 8 Exhibit M - Part 1, # 9 Exhibit M - Part 2, # 10 Exhibit O, # 11 Exhibit S, # 12 Exhibit T, # 13 Exhibit U, # 14 Exhibit V, # 15 Exhibit W, # 16 Exhibit X, # 17 Exhibit Z, # 18 Exhibit DD, # 19 Exhibit FF) (Schaefer, Enrico)
July 15, 2011 Filing 189 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit N, # 12 Exhibit P, # 13 Exhibit Q, # 14 Exhibit R, # 15 Exhibit Y, # 16 Exhibit AA - Part 1, # 17 Exhibit AA - Part 2, # 18 Exhibit BB, # 19 Exhibit CC, # 20 Exhibit EE, # 21 Exhibit GG, # 22 Exhibit HH, # 23 [PLACED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO 192 ] Exhibit II, # 24 Exhibit JJ, # 25 Exhibit KK, # 26 Exhibit LL - Part 1, # 27 Exhibit LL - Part 2, # 28 Exhibit MM, # 29 Exhibit NN) (Schaefer, Enrico) Modified on 8/2/2011 (DWor).
July 15, 2011 Filing 188 DECLARATION by William A. Delgado re 187 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H) (Delgado, William)
July 15, 2011 Filing 187 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Delgado, William)
July 15, 2011 Filing 186 APPENDIX re: 178 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Epic Media Group, Incorporated. by Epic Media Group, Incorporated (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13) (Delgado, William)
July 15, 2011 Filing 185 DECLARATION by William A. Delgado re 178 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Epic Media Group, Incorporated (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit I, # 2 Exhibit J, # 3 Exhibit K) (Delgado, William)
July 15, 2011 Filing 184 SEALED EXHIBIT H re 179 Declaration, by Epic Media Group, Incorporated. (Delgado, William)
July 15, 2011 Filing 183 SEALED EXHIBIT G re 179 Declaration, by Epic Media Group, Incorporated. (Delgado, William)
July 15, 2011 Filing 182 SEALED EXHIBIT F re 179 Declaration, by Epic Media Group, Incorporated. (Delgado, William)
July 15, 2011 Filing 181 SEALED EXHIBIT C re 179 Declaration, by Epic Media Group, Incorporated. (Delgado, William)
July 15, 2011 Filing 180 SEALED EXHIBIT B re 179 Declaration, by Epic Media Group, Incorporated. (Delgado, William)
July 15, 2011 Filing 179 DECLARATION by David Graff re 178 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Epic Media Group, Incorporated (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H) (Delgado, William)
July 15, 2011 Filing 178 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Epic Media Group, Incorporated. (Delgado, William)
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 177 OPINION AND ORDER denying 149 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (BThe)
June 9, 2011 Filing 176 STIPULATION regarding deposition of David Graff, Esq. by All Defendants (Delgado, William)
April 26, 2011 Filing 175 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney J. Michael Huget by Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Huget, J.)
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 174 TRIAL MANAGEMENT ORDER: Motions in Limine due and Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/26/2011 02:00 PM; Jury Trial set for 10/3/2011 09:00 AM before District Judge Marianne O. Battani (REFER TO IMAGE FOR FURTHER DETAILS). Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (BThe)
April 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 173 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 7/15/2011; Responses due 8/15/2011; Replies due 8/30/2011; Hearing on Motion 9/15/2011 at 2:30 p.m. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (Refer to image for additional dates) (CMot)
April 14, 2011 Filing 172 Notice of Filing Transcript. (Smith, R.)
April 14, 2011 Filing 171 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on April 7, 2011. (Court Reporter: Robert L. Smith) (Number of Pages: 33) Redaction Request due 5/5/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/16/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/13/2011. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Smith, R.)
April 13, 2011 Minute Entry - Telephone Conference held on 4/13/2011 before District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (CMot)
April 8, 2011 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 4/13/2011 10:00 AM; Discovery due by 6/30/2011; Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 7/15/2011; Motion Hearing set for 9/22/2011 02:00 PM before District Judge Marianne O. Battani (BThe)
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER denying 152 Motion to Compel; granting 155 Motion for Clarification. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (BThe)
April 7, 2011 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 4/13/2011 10:00 AM before District Judge Marianne O. Battani (CMot)
April 7, 2011 Minute Entry - Motion Hearing held on 4/7/2011 re 152 MOTION to Compel Documents Considered by Testifying Expert filed by Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated, 155 MOTION for Clarification re 146 Order on Motion for Protective Order, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief MOTION for Clarification re 146 Order on Motion for Protective Order, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated before District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (Court Reporter Robert L. Smith) (CMot)
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 169 OPINION AND ORDER denying 122 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (BThe)
March 18, 2011 Filing 168 REPLY to Response re 149 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) filed by Connexus Corporation, Epic Media Group, Incorporated, Firstlook, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Delgado, William)
March 16, 2011 Filing 167 REPLY to Response re 155 MOTION for Clarification re 146 Order on Motion for Protective Order, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief MOTION for Clarification re 146 Order on Motion for Protective Order, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Delgado, William)
March 16, 2011 Filing 166 REPLY to Response re 152 MOTION to Compel Documents Considered by Testifying Expert filed by Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Delgado, William)
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER With Stipulation for Reply Brief Page Extension. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (BThe)
March 10, 2011 Filing 164 STIPULATION re 152 MOTION to Compel Documents Considered by Testifying Expert for additional reply brief pages by Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated (Delgado, William)
March 3, 2011 Filing 163 SEALED EXHIBIT re 149 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit H) (Schaefer, Enrico)
March 3, 2011 Filing 162 RESPONSE to 149 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) filed by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P) (Schaefer, Enrico)
March 1, 2011 Filing 161 RESPONSE to 155 MOTION for Clarification re 146 Order on Motion for Protective Order, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief MOTION for Clarification re 146 Order on Motion for Protective Order, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D) (Schaefer, Enrico)
March 1, 2011 Filing 160 SEALED EXHIBIT A - Expert Report by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Schaefer, Enrico)
March 1, 2011 Filing 159 RESPONSE to 152 MOTION to Compel Documents Considered by Testifying Expert filed by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A - filed under seal, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C) (Schaefer, Enrico)
March 1, 2011 Filing 158 SEALED EXHIBIT re 152 MOTION to Compel Documents Considered by Testifying Expert by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Schaefer, Enrico)[FILED IN ERROR; INCORRECT DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED; TO BE RE-E-FILED] Modified on 3/1/2011 (DPer).
March 1, 2011 Filing 157 RESPONSE to 152 MOTION to Compel Documents Considered by Testifying Expert filed by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A - filed under seal, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C) (Schaefer, Enrico)[FILED IN ERROR; INCORRECT DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED; TO BE RE-E-FILED] Modified on 3/1/2011 (DPer).
February 18, 2011 Reset Deadlines as to 152 MOTION to Compel Documents Considered by Testifying Expert, 155 MOTION for Clarification re 146 Order on Motion for Protective Order, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief MOTION for Clarification re 146 Order on Motion for Protective Order, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Motion Hearing reset for 4/7/2011 03:00 PM before District Judge Marianne O Battani (CMot)
February 16, 2011 Filing 156 NOTICE of hearing on 155 MOTION for Clarification re 146 Order on Motion for Protective Order, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief MOTION for Clarification re 146 Order on Motion for Protective Order, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Responses due by 3/1/2011 Replies due by 3/16/2011 Motion Hearing set for 3/23/2011 03:30 PM before District Judge Marianne O Battani. (CMot)
February 15, 2011 Filing 155 MOTION for Clarification re 146 Order on Motion for Protective Order, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B) (Delgado, William)
February 15, 2011 Filing 154 NOTICE of hearing on 152 MOTION to Compel Documents Considered by Testifying Expert. Responses due by 3/1/2011 Replies due by 3/16/2011 Motion Hearing set for 3/23/2011 03:30 PM before District Judge Marianne O Battani. (CMot)
February 10, 2011 Filing 153 SEALED EXHIBIT H re 152 MOTION to Compel Documents Considered by Testifying Expert by Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Delgado, William)
February 10, 2011 Filing 152 MOTION to Compel Documents Considered by Testifying Expert by Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G) (Delgado, William)
February 4, 2011 Filing 151 NOTICE of hearing on 149 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2). Responses due by 3/3/2011 Replies due by 3/18/2011; Decided on the briefs, no hearing will be held (CMot)
February 3, 2011 Filing 150 DECLARATION by Charles Nowaczek re 149 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) filed by Connexus Corporation, Epic Media Group, Incorporated, Firstlook, Incorporated (Delgado, William)
February 3, 2011 Filing 149 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) by Connexus Corporation, Epic Media Group, Incorporated, Firstlook, Incorporated. (Delgado, William)
January 21, 2011 Filing 148 SUMMONS Issued for *Epic Media Group, Incorporated* (PMil)
January 20, 2011 REQUEST for SUMMONS for Epic Media Group, Incorporated. (Schaefer, Enrico)
January 20, 2011 Filing 147 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Weather Underground, Incorporated against Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated, Epic Media Group, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Index of Exhibits G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Exhibit T, # 22 Exhibit U, # 23 Exhibit V) (Schaefer, Enrico)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER denying 125 Motion for Protective Order; granting 131 Motion for Joinder to Add Party Defendants'.. Signed by District Judge Marianne O Battani. (BThe)
January 13, 2011 Minute Entry - Motion Hearing held on 1/13/2011 re 125 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated, 122 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated, 131 MOTION for Joinder to Add Party Defendants filed by Weather Underground, Incorporated before District Judge Marianne O Battani. (Court Reporter Robert L. Smith) (CMot)
December 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER to Extend Time for Expert Discovery re 143 Stipulation filed by Firstlook, Incorporated, Connexus Corporation, Basic Fusion, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated, Weather Underground, Incorporated. Expert Discovery set for 1/11/2011 Signed by District Judge Marianne O Battani. (BThe)
December 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER to Extend Expert Discovery re 143 Stipulation filed by Firstlook, Incorporated, Connexus Corporation, Basic Fusion, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated, Weather Underground, Incorporated. Expert Discovery set for 1/11/2011 Signed by District Judge Marianne O Battani. (BThe) (BThe).
December 22, 2010 Filing 143 STIPULATION to Extend Expert Discovery by All Parties (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Schaefer, Enrico)
December 17, 2010 Filing 142 REPLY to Response re 125 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Delgado, William)
December 17, 2010 Filing 141 REPLY to Response re 122 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L) (Delgado, William)
December 13, 2010 Filing 140 SEALED EXHIBIT C re 139 Reply to Response to Motion by All Plaintiffs. (Schaefer, Enrico)
December 13, 2010 Filing 139 REPLY to Response re 131 MOTION for Joinder to Add Party Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Schaefer, Enrico)
December 3, 2010 Filing 138 SEALED EXHIBIT A - compilation of deposition transcripts re 137 Response to Motion, by Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Steffans, Benjamin)
December 3, 2010 Filing 137 RESPONSE to 131 MOTION for Joinder to Add Party Defendants filed by Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A - Compilation of Deposition Transcripts - filed under seal, # 3 Exhibit B - Unpublished Cases, # 4 Exhibit C - Plaintiff's Supplemental Domain List, # 5 Exhibit D - California Complaint, # 6 Exhibit D-2 - California Complaint cont.) (Steffans, Benjamin)
November 30, 2010 Filing 136 SEALED EXHIBIT to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion for Protective Order by All Plaintiffs. (Schaefer, Enrico)
November 30, 2010 Filing 135 RESPONSE to 125 MOTION for Protective Order filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C) (Schaefer, Enrico)
November 30, 2010 Filing 134 DECLARATION by Brian A Hall to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by All Plaintiffs (Schaefer, Enrico)
November 30, 2010 Filing 133 SEALED REPLY to Response re 122 Motion for Summary Judgment by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H) (Schaefer, Enrico)
November 22, 2010 Filing 132 NOTICE of hearing on 131 MOTION for Joinder to Add Party Defendants. Responses due by 12/3/2010 Replies due by 12/14/2010 Motion Hearing set for 1/13/2011 03:00 PM before District Judge Marianne O Battani. (CMot)
November 18, 2010 Filing 131 MOTION for Joinder to Add Party Defendants by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N) (Schaefer, Enrico)
November 12, 2010 Filing 130 WITNESS LIST by Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated (Delgado, William)
November 10, 2010 Filing 129 WITNESS LIST by All Plaintiffs (Schaefer, Enrico)
November 9, 2010 Filing 128 NOTICE of hearing on 125 MOTION for Protective Order. Responses due by 11/30/2010 Replies due by 12/17/2010 Motion Hearing set for 1/13/2011 03:00 PM before District Judge Marianne O Battani. (CMot)
November 8, 2010 Filing 127 SEALED EXHIBIT F re 126 Declaration, by Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Delgado, William)
November 8, 2010 Filing 126 DECLARATION by William A. Delgado re 125 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I) (Delgado, William)
November 8, 2010 Filing 125 MOTION for Protective Order by Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Delgado, William)
October 28, 2010 Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Status Conference reset for 1/13/2011 03:00 PM before District Judge Marianne O Battani (CMot)
October 28, 2010 Filing 124 NOTICE of hearing on 122 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 11/30/2010 Replies due by 12/17/2010 Motion Hearing set for 1/13/2011 03:00 PM before District Judge Marianne O Battani. (CMot)
October 26, 2010 Filing 123 SEALED EXHIBIT E re 122 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Delgado, William)
October 26, 2010 Filing 122 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit F) (Delgado, William)
October 6, 2010 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference reset for 1/10/2011 02:00 PM before District Judge Marianne O Battani (BThe)
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 121 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Appointment of Special Master and Extension of Discovery, ( Discovery due by 12/10/2010) Signed by District Judge Marianne O Battani. (BThe)
September 17, 2010 Filing 120 Notice of Filing Transcript. (Sapala, C)
September 17, 2010 Filing 119 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 9-10-2010. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol S. Sapala) (Number of Pages: 26) Redaction Request due 10/8/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/18/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/16/2010. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Sapala, C)
September 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER Denying 102 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Weather Underground, Incorporated and Discovery extended to 12/10/2010 - Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia M Morgan. (JJoh)
September 10, 2010 Minute Entry - Motion Hearing held on 9/10/2010 re 102 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Weather Underground, Incorporated before Magistrate Judge Virginia M Morgan. Disposition: Denied. (Tape #VMM 9/10/2010) (JJoh)
August 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 117 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Hearing re 102 MOTION to Compel Discovery : Motion Hearing adjourned to 9/10/2010 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Virginia M Morgan in Ann Arbor - Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia M Morgan. (JJoh)
August 29, 2010 Filing 116 STIPULATION re 114 Notice of Hearing on Motion, requesting continuance of hearing date by Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated (Delgado, William)
August 23, 2010 Filing 115 RESPONSE to 102 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D) (Delgado, William)
August 17, 2010 Filing 114 NOTICE of hearing on 102 MOTION to Compel Discovery: Responses due by 8/23/2010, Resolved/Unresolved Issues due by 8/30/2010, and Motion Hearing set for 9/2/2010 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Virginia M Morgan in Ann Arbor. (JJoh)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 113 STIPULATED ORDER for Substitution of Counsel. Signed by District Judge Marianne O Battani. (CGre)
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Virginia M Morgan: 102 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Weather Underground, Incorporated. Signed by District Judge Marianne O Battani. (BThe)
August 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER Denying re 94 Objection to Magistrate Judge's Order Denying Motion for Leave to File Counterclaim. Signed by District Judge Marianne O Battani. (BThe)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 110 SEALED EXHIBIT N by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Schaefer, Enrico)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 109 SEALED EXHIBIT M by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Schaefer, Enrico)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 108 SEALED EXHIBIT K by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Schaefer, Enrico)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 107 SEALED EXHIBIT H by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Schaefer, Enrico)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 106 SEALED EXHIBIT G by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Schaefer, Enrico)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 105 SEALED EXHIBIT E by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Schaefer, Enrico)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 104 SEALED EXHIBIT D by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Schaefer, Enrico)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 103 SEALED EXHIBIT B re 102 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Schaefer, Enrico)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N) (Schaefer, Enrico)
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 101 REPLY to Response to Objection to Magistrate's Ruling filed by Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit K, # 3 Exhibit L) (Delgado, William)
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 100 SEALED EXHIBIT B to Response to Objection to Order re Motion to File Counterclaim by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Schaefer, Enrico)
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 99 SEALED EXHIBIT A to Response to Objection to Order re Motion to File Counterclaim by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Schaefer, Enrico)
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 98 RESPONSE to 94 Objection, Order on Motion to File Counterclaim by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D) (Schaefer, Enrico)
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 97 NOTICE by All Defendants of withdrawal of 96 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Motion to Withdraw From ECF Service and Case Caption John P. Jacobs. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit) (Jacobs, John)
July 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Motion to Withdraw From ECF Service and Case Caption John P. Jacobs by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit Stipulated Order for Substitution of Counsel) (Jacobs, John)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 95 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time re 82 Order on Motion to Compel - Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia M Morgan. (JJoh)
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 94 OBJECTION to 90 Order on Motion for Leave to File by Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J) (Delgado, William)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 93 STIPULATION re 82 Order on Motion to Compel, by Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated (Delgado, William)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Notice of Filing Transcript. (JCha)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 91 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on June 14, 2010. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Deborah Kremlick) (Number of Pages: 19) Redaction Request due 7/12/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/22/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/20/2010. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (JCha)
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER denying 77 Motion for Leave to File Counterclaim - Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia M Morgan. (JJoh)
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Minute Entry - Motion Hearing held on 6/14/2010 re 77 MOTION for Leave to File Counterclaim filed by Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated before Magistrate Judge Virginia M Morgan. Disposition: Denied. (Tape #VMM 6/14/2010) (JJoh)
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Notice of Filing Transcript. (JCha)
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 88 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on May 19, 2010. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Deborah Kremlick) (Number of Pages: 50) Redaction Request due 7/6/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/15/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/13/2010. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (JCha)
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Notice of Filing Transcript. (JCha)
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 86 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on May 12, 2010. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Deborah Kremlick) (Number of Pages: 19) Redaction Request due 7/6/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/15/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/13/2010. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (JCha)
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 85 DECLARATION by William A. Delgado re 84 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit K) (Delgado, William)
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 84 REPLY to Response re 77 MOTION for Leave to File Counterclaim filed by Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Delgado, William)
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Set Scheduling Order Deadlines: Status Conference set for 10/18/2010 02:00 PM before District Judge Marianne O Battani (CMot)
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Minute Entry - Status Conference held on 6/3/2010 before District Judge Marianne O Battani. (Court Reporter Robert L. Smith) (CMot)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 83 RESPONSE to 77 MOTION for Leave to File Counterclaim filed by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Schaefer, Enrico)
May 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER Compelling Discovery re: 46 and 61 Motions to Compel - Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia M Morgan. (JJoh)
May 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 81 NOTICE of hearing on 77 MOTION for Leave to File Counterclaim. Responses due by 5/28/2010 and Motion Hearing set for 6/14/2010 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Virginia M Morgan in Ann Arbor. (JJoh)
May 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATED ORDER Compelling Discovery re: 46 and 61 MOTIONS to Compel, and granting 70 Motion to Extend Discovery - Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia M Morgan. (JJoh)
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Minute Entry - Motion Hearing held on 5/19/2010 re 46 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Weather Underground, Incorporated, and 61 MOTION to Compel Further Responses and Production of Documents filed by Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated before Magistrate Judge Virginia M Morgan. Disposition: Hearing concluded and motions granted in part. (Tape #VMM 5/19/2010) (JJoh)
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order HEARING continued as to unresolved issues re: 61 MOTION to Compel Further Responses and Production of Documents and 46 MOTION to Compel Discovery. Motion Hearing set for 5/19/2010 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Virginia M Morgan in Ann Arbor. (JJoh)
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Minute Entry - Motion Hearing held on 5/12/2010 re 46 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Weather Underground, Incorporated, 61 MOTION to Compel Further Responses and Production of Documents filed by Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated, and 70 MOTION TO EXTEND Discovery Deadlines filed by Weather Underground, Incorporated before Magistrate Judge Virginia M Morgan. Disposition: Hearing held and continued to 5/19/2010 at 2:30 p.m. Stip(s) and order(s) will be submitted on the resolved issues. (Tape #VMM 5/12/2010) (JJoh)
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Virginia M Morgan: 77 MOTION for Leave to File Counterclaim filed by Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. Signed by District Judge Marianne O Battani. (BThe)
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 DECLARATION by William A. Delgado re 77 MOTION for Leave to File Counterclaim filed by Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Delgado Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A to Counterclaim, # 3 Exhibit B to Counterclaim, # 4 Exhibit C to Counterclaim, # 5 Exhibit D to Counterclaim, # 6 Exhibit E to Counterclaim, # 7 Exhibit F to Counterclaim, # 8 Exhibit G to Counterclaim, # 9 Exhibit H to Counterclaim, # 10 Exhibit I to Counterclaim, # 11 Exhibit J to Counterclaim) (Delgado, William)
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MOTION for Leave to File Counterclaim by Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Delgado, William)
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference reset for 6/3/2010 04:00 PM before District Judge Marianne O Battani (Judge not available on 5/12). (BThe)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 REPLY to Response re 61 MOTION to Compel Further Responses and Production of Documents filed by Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit J) (Delgado, William)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 RESPONSE to 70 MOTION TO EXTEND Discovery Deadlines filed by Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C) (Delgado, William)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 74 DECLARATION by Enrico Schaefer in Support of Response to Def's Motion to Compel Discovery filed by Weather Underground, Incorporated (Schaefer, Enrico)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 73 RESPONSE to 61 MOTION to Compel Further Responses and Production of Documents filed by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Schaefer, Enrico)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 NOTICE of hearing on 70 MOTION TO EXTEND Discovery Deadlines, 61 MOTION to Compel Further Responses and Production of Documents: Responses due by 5/7/2010 and Motion Hearing set for 5/12/2010 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Virginia M Morgan in Ann Arbor. (JJoh)
April 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Virginia M Morgan: 70 MOTION TO EXTEND Discovery Deadlines filed by Weather Underground, Incorporated. Signed by District Judge Marianne O Battani. (BThe)
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MOTION TO EXTEND Discovery Deadlines by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F) (Schaefer, Enrico)
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 EXHIBIT M re 46 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Weather Underground, Incorporated (Schaefer, Enrico)
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 EXHIBIT L re 46 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Weather Underground, Incorporated (Schaefer, Enrico)
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 67 EXHIBIT K re 46 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Weather Underground, Incorporated (Schaefer, Enrico)
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 EXHIBIT J re 46 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Weather Underground, Incorporated (Schaefer, Enrico)
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 EXHIBIT I re 46 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Weather Underground, Incorporated (Schaefer, Enrico)
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 SEALED EXHIBIT N re 46 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Schaefer, Enrico)
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Virginia M Morgan: 61 MOTION to Compel Further Responses and Production of Documents filed by Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. Signed by District Judge Marianne O Battani. (BThe)
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 DECLARATION by William A. Delgado re 61 MOTION to Compel Further Responses and Production of Documents filed by Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I) (Delgado, William)
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MOTION to Compel Further Responses and Production of Documents by Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Delgado, William)
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting 57 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia M Morgan. (DEld)
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 DECLARATION by Enrico Schaefer filed by Weather Underground, Incorporated (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Schaefer, Enrico)
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 REPLY to Response re 46 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Schaefer, Enrico)
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MOTION to Strike Attachment #9 - Exhibits I-N by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - 04-12-10 ltr from Delgado) (Schaefer, Enrico) Modified on 4/19/2010 (BSoc). [DOCMENT IS TITLED MOTION TO FILE EXHIBIT UNDER SEAL]
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE of hearing on 46 MOTION to Compel Discovery: Resolved/Unresolved Issues due by 5/5/2010 and Motion Hearing set for 5/12/2010 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Virginia M Morgan in Ann Arbor. (JJoh)
April 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Notice of Filing Transcript. (JCha)
April 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on March 15, 2010. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Deborah Kremlick) (Number of Pages: 22) Redaction Request due 4/28/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/10/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/6/2010. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (JCha)
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Virginia M Morgan: 46 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Weather Underground, Incorporated. Signed by District Judge Marianne O Battani. (BThe)
March 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 DECLARATION by Enrico Schaefer re 46 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Weather Underground, Incorporated (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Schaefer, Enrico)
March 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C, # 2 Exhibit D, Part 1, # 3 Exhibit E, # 4 Exhibit F, Part 1, # 5 Exhibit F, Part 2, # 6 Exhibit G, # 7 Exhibit H, # 8[STRICKEN] Exhibit I - N, # 9 Exhibit D, Part 2) (Schaefer, Enrico) Modified on 4/19/2010 (DEld).
March 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER denying 36 Motion for Protective Order - Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia M Morgan. (JJoh)
March 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Minute Entry - Motion Hearing held on 3/15/2010 re 36 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated before Magistrate Judge Virginia M Morgan. Disposition: Denied. (Tape #VMM 3/15/2010) (JJoh)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 REPLY to Response re 36 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Delgado, William)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE of hearing on 36 MOTION for Protective Order: Motion Hearing set for 3/15/2010 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Virginia M Morgan in Ann Arbor. (JJoh)
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 RESPONSE to 36 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - List of Michigan Companies, # 2 Exhibit B - Subpoena Served in Facebook, # 3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Seth Jacoby dated 06-16-2008) (Schaefer, Enrico)
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPUATED PROTECTIVE ORDER - Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia M Morgan. (JJoh)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting in part 29 Motion to Compel and for Sanctions - Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia M Morgan. (JJoh)
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Virginia M Morgan: 36 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. Signed by District Judge Marianne O Battani. (BThe)
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Minute Entry - Motion Hearing held on 2/11/2010 re 29 MOTION to Compel Disclosures and for Sanctions filed by Weather Underground, Incorporated before Magistrate Judge Virginia M Morgan. Disposition: granted (Tape #VMM 2/11/2010) (JJoh)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings as to 29 MOTION to Compel Disclosures and for Sanctions : Motion Hearing set for 2/11/2010 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Virginia M Morgan in Ann Arbor - Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia M Morgan. (JJoh)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Michael Huget on behalf of Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated, Basic Fusion, Incorporated, Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated. (Huget, J.)
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 DECLARATION by William A. Delgado re 36 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H) (Delgado, William)
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION for Protective Order by Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit In re Remec, # 2 Exhibit In Re Ashworth, # 3 Exhibit Auto-Owners) (Delgado, William)
January 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE of hearing on 29 MOTION to Compel Disclosures and for Sanctions. Resolved/Unresolved Issues due by 2/5/2010 Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2010 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Virginia M Morgan. (JJoh)
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 RESPONSE to 29 MOTION to Compel Disclosures and for Sanctions filed by Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Delgado, William)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Delgado, William)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Virginia M Morgan: 29 MOTION to Compel Disclosures and for Sanctions filed by Weather Underground, Incorporated. Signed by District Judge Marianne O Battani. (BThe)
January 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 5/12/2010 02:30 PM before District Judge Marianne O Battani Discovery due by 7/12/2010 Signed by District Judge Marianne O Battani. (Refer to image for additional dates) (CMot)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Minute Entry - Scheduling Conference held on 1/11/2010 before District Judge Marianne O Battani. (Court Reporter Rob L. Smith) (CMot)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying 22 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Marianne O Battani. (BThe)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION to Compel Disclosures and for Sanctions by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures, # 2 Exhibit B - Defendant's Initial Disclosures) (Schaefer, Enrico)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATED ORDER for Substitution of Counsel. Signed by District Judge Marianne O Battani. (CGre)
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Delgado, William)
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin K. Steffans on behalf of Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Steffans, Benjamin) [INCORRECT CASE NUMBER LISTED ON DOCUMENT] Modified on 1/6/2010 (DEld).
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - 01-02-10 email from Delgado, # 2 Exhibit B - 01-04-10 email and letter to Delgado, # 3 Exhibit C - 01-04-10 ltr from Delgado) (Schaefer, Enrico)
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by William A Delgado on behalf of Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated, Basic Fusion, Incorporated, Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated. (Delgado, William)
December 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 1/11/2010 03:30 PM before District Judge Marianne O Battani (REFER TO IMAGE FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (BThe)
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Reconsideration of November 13, Opinion And Order by Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated. (Jacobs, John)
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 15 Motion to Dismiss. The Court dismisses Connexus, Basic Fusion, and First Look. Further, the Court denies Defendants' request for transfer.. Signed by District Judge Marianne O Battani. (BThe)
July 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Minute Entry -Motion Hearing held on 7/22/2009 re 15 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(2) Or, In The Alternative, Transfer MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(2) Or, In The Alternative, Transfer MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(2) Or, In The Alternative, Transfer filed by Firstlook, Incorporated, Connexus Corporation, Basic Fusion, Incorporated, Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated before District Judge Marianne O Battani. (Court Reporter Allen Burnham) (CMot)
May 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPLY to Response re 15 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(2) Or, In The Alternative, Transfer Reply Memorandum In Support filed by Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated, Basic Fusion, Incorporated, Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated. (Jacobs, John) Modified on 5/27/2009 (PMil).
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Jeff Ferguson re 18 Response to Motion,, by Weather Underground, Incorporated (Patti, Anthony)
May 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONSE to 15 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(2) Or, In The Alternative, Transfer MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(2) Or, In The Alternative, Transfer MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(2) Or, In The Alternative, Transfer filed by Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit) (Schaefer, Enrico)
May 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines as to 15 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(2) Or, In The Alternative, Transfer MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(2) Or, In The Alternative, Transfer MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(2) Or, In The Alternative, Transfer. Motion Hearing reset for 7/22/2009 03:00 PM before District Judge Marianne O Battani (CMot)
April 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 EXHIBIT "A" to Declaration of Seth Jacoby re 15 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(2) Or, In The Alternative, Transfer MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(2) Or, In The Alternative, Transfer MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(2) Or, In The Alternative, Transfer by Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated, Basic Fusion, Incorporated, Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Seth Jacoby) (Jacobs, John)
April 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of hearing on 15 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(2) Or, In The Alternative, Transfer MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(2) Or, In The Alternative, Transfer MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(2) Or, In The Alternative, Transfer. Responses due by 5/15/2009 Replies due by 6/1/2009 Motion Hearing set for 7/8/2009 02:00 PM before District Judge Marianne O Battani. (CMot)
April 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(2) Or, In The Alternative, Transfer by Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated, Basic Fusion, Incorporated, Connexus Corporation, Firstlook, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A-Judicial Caseload Profile Report for the Central District of California, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B-Judicial Caseload Profile Report for the Eastern District of Michigan, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C-Printouts of Plaintiff's Website, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D-Printouts of Cases in Support of Motion to Dismiss) (Jacobs, John)
April 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: John P. Jacobs appearing on behalf of Connexus Corporation as Local Counsel (Jacobs, John) Modified on 4/15/2009 (PMil).[APPEARANCE ALSO FILED ON BEHALF OF NAVIGATION CATALYST SYSTEMS, INC., BASIC FUSION AND FIRSTLOOK, INCORPORATED]
March 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated served on 3/9/2009, answer due 3/30/2009. (Hall - NOT SWORN, Brian)
March 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Basic Fusion, Incorporated served on 3/9/2009, answer due 3/30/2009. (Hall - NOT SWORN, Brian)
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Firstlook, Incorporated served on 3/5/2009, answer due 3/25/2009. (Schaefer, Enrico)
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Connexus Corporation served on 3/5/2009, answer due 3/25/2009. (Schaefer, Enrico)
March 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian A. Hall - NOT SWORN on behalf of Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Hall - NOT SWORN, Brian)
March 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony P. Patti on behalf of Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Patti, Anthony)
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued for *Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated* (LBeh)
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued for *Firstlook, Incorporated* (LBeh)
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Connexus Corporation* (LBeh)
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Basic Fusion, Incorporated* (LBeh)
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Trademark Report Sent To Washington (Schaefer, Craig)
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig E. Schaefer on behalf of The Weather Underground, Incorporated. (Schaefer, Craig)
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by The Weather Underground, Incorporated against all defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 06450000000001890467 - Fee: $ 350. County of 1st Plaintiff: Washtenaw - County Where Action Arose: Washtenaw - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Wunderground's Blog Directory, # 2 Exhibit Printout of wunderground.com, # 3 Exhibit Quantcast Results for wunderground.com, # 4 Exhibit Printout of Display on Third Party Web Site, # 5 Exhibit Printout of Wunderground's Web Site After User Clicked on Display, # 6 Exhibit List of Domains Owned by Wunderground, # 7 Exhibit True Copy of US Reg No 2,297,683, # 8 Exhibit True Copy of Secs 8 and 15 for US Reg No 2,297.683, # 9 Exhibit True Copy of US REg No 2,324,272, # 10 Exhibit True Copy of Secs 8 and 15 for US Reg No 2,324,272, # 11 Exhibit True Copy of US Reg No 2,281,088, # 12 Index of Exhibits True Copy of Secs 8 and 15 for US Reg No 2,281,088, # 13 Exhibit True Copy of US Reg No 2,447,954, # 14 Exhibit True Copy of Secs 8 and 15 for US Reg No 2,447,954, # 15 Exhibit True Coyp of US Reg No 3,527,030, # 16 Exhibit Prinout of Serial No. 77-631,410, # 17 Exhibit Printout of qwunderground.com, # 18 Exhibit Table of Domain Names Registered to Navigation Catalyst Systetms, # 19 Exhibit Prinout of udergroundweather.com, # 20 Exhibit Prinout of Links fro udergroundweather.com, # 21 Exhibit WHOIS for wunderphotos.com, # 22 Exhibit Printout of Web Site fro wunderphotos.com) (Schaefer, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weather Underground, Incorporated v. Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Weather Underground, Incorporated
Represented By: Enrico Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navigation Catalyst Systems, Incorporated
Represented By: John P. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Basic Fusion, Incorporated
Represented By: John P. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connexus Corporation
Represented By: John P. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Firstlook, Incorporated
Represented By: John P. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?