American Institute for Preventive Medicine, Incorporated v. Oakstone Publishing, LLC
Plaintiff: American Institute for Preventive Medicine, Incorporated
Defendant: Oakstone Publishing, LLC
Counter Defendant: American Institute for Preventive Medicine, Incorporated
Counter Claimant: Oakstone Publishing, LLC
Case Number: 2:2009cv11195
Filed: March 31, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Cleland
Presiding Judge: Whalen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER STAYING proceedings pending settlement negotiations and setting, ( Telephone Conference for 5/14/2010 02:00 PM before District Judge Robert H Cleland) Signed by District Judge Robert H Cleland. (LWag)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER AMENDING May 22, 2009 Scheduling Order and Setting Deadlines and Trial Date, (All Trial Documents due by 5/10/2010, Final Pretrial (Telephone)Conference set for 5/17/2010 @ 2:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 5/24/2010 @ 9:00 AM before District Judge Robert H Cleland. Signed by District Judge Robert H Cleland. (Goltz, D)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 22 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment on Defendant's Counterclaim; denying 24 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Count I; denying 25 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to its Counterclaim. Signed by District Judge Robert H Cleland. (LWag)
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by District Judge Robert H Cleland. (LWag)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Institute for Preventive Medicine, Incorporated v. Oakstone Publishing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: American Institute for Preventive Medicine, Incorporated
Represented By: Patrice S. Arend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Oakstone Publishing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Institute for Preventive Medicine, Incorporated
Represented By: Patrice S. Arend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakstone Publishing, LLC
Represented By: Robert J. Lenihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?