Gordon et al v. Royal Palm Real Estate Investment Fund I, LLLP,

Plaintiff: Robert D Gordon
Defendant: Royal Palm Real Estate Investment Fund I, LLLP, Royal Palm Investment Management Company, LLC, Royal Marketing Services, LLC, Robert Rosetto, Roxanne Rosetto, Bruce Rosetto, Alan D Goddard, Jr, Michael A Lichtenstein and Eric Bloom
Case Number: 2:2009cv11770
Filed: May 7, 2009
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
Office: Detroit Office
County: Oakland
Presiding Judge: Cook
Referring Judge: Morgan
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 9, 2016 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 76 MOTION to Reopen Case and to Lift Stay of Action and denying 77 MOTION for Settlement Conference and Mediation and to Defer Consideration of Receiver's Motion to Reopen Case. Status Conference set for 12/21/2016 11:00 AM before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
October 24, 2013 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 73 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Julian Abele Cook. (KDoa)
March 8, 2011 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice as to Goddard, Lichtenstein and Bloom; denying 28 Motion for Sanctions; granting 35 Motion to Stay case pending a resolution of the arbitration. Signed by District Judge Julian Abele Cook. (KDoa)
January 10, 2011 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 46 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by District Judge Julian Abele Cook. (KDoa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gordon et al v. Royal Palm Real Estate Investment Fund I, LLLP,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert D Gordon
Represented By: Charles E. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Palm Real Estate Investment Fund I, LLLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Palm Investment Management Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Marketing Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Rosetto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roxanne Rosetto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Rosetto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan D Goddard, Jr
Represented By: Carl F. Schoeppl - NOT SWORN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A Lichtenstein
Represented By: Carl F. Schoeppl - NOT SWORN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Bloom
Represented By: Carl F. Schoeppl - NOT SWORN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?