Methode Electronics, Inc. v. Delphi Automotive Systems LLC et al
Plaintiff: Methode Electronics, Inc.
Defendant: Delphi Automotive Systems LLC and Marian, Incorporated
Counter Claimant: Delphi Automotive Systems LLC and Delphi Technologies, Inc.
Counter Defendant: Methode Electronics, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2009cv13078
Filed: August 5, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Borman
Presiding Judge: Morgan
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 206 OPINION and ORDER GRANTING re (136 in 2:09-cv-14303-PDB-MKM, 176 in 2:09-cv-13078-PDB-MKM) MOTION to Strike Statement of Opposition to the Objection of Methode Electronics, Inc. to the Response by the Special Master to the Objections of the Partie s filed by Methode Electronics, Inc., ADOPTS AND MODIFIES IN PART, (119 in 2:09-cv-13078-PDB-MKM, 79 in 2:09-cv-14303-PDB-MKM) Report of Special Master filed by Jay G Taylor, GRANTS (84 in 2:09-cv-14303-PDB-MKM, 124 in 2:09-cv-13078-PDB-MKM) MOTI ON to Strike the Declaration of Charles A. Garris, Jr., Dkt. 121-3 filed by Delphi Automotive Systems LLC, Delphi Technologies, Inc., Marian, Incorporated. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-13078-PDB-MKM, 2:09-cv-14303-PDB-MKM (DGoo)
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 186 OPINION ORDER denying (170) Motion to Stay; dismissing (171) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 2:09-cv-13078-PDB-MKM; denying (130) Motion to Stay; dismissing (131) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 2:09-cv-14303-PDB-MKM and cancelling 3/15/2012 hearing.. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-13078-PDB-MKM, 2:09-cv-14303-PDB-MKM (DGoo)
December 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER Requesting Special Master Jay G. Taylor to Respond on or before 1/31/2012 to the Parties' Objections re (79 in 2:09-cv-14303-PDB-MKM) to the Report of Special Master; Responses due within 14 days to the response to the objections filed by Jay G Taylor. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-13078-PDB-MKM, 2:09-cv-14303-PDB-MKM (LWag)
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting in part and denying in part (103) Motion to Compel in case 2:09-cv-13078-PDB-MKM; granting in part and denying in part (63) Motion to Compel in case 2:09-cv-14303-PDB-MKM - Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-13078-PDB-MKM, 2:09-cv-14303-PDB-MKM (LBar)
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER ADJOURNING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING SCHEDULED FOR FEBRUARY 17, 2011 and proposing appointment of a Special Master. Signed by District Judge Paul D Borman. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-13078-PDB-VMM, 2:09-cv-14303-PDB-VMM (DGoo)
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER to Strike (29 in 2:09-cv-14303-PDB-VMM) Memorandum Opinion & Order,. Signed by District Judge Paul D Borman. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-13078-PDB-VMM, 2:09-cv-14303-PDB-VMM (DGoo)
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER setting aside re 47 Protective Order. THE COURT WILL HOLD A HEARING ON JANUARY 8, 2010 AT 3 PM ON PLAINTIFF/COUNTER-DEFENDANT METHODE ELECTRONICS, INC.S TIMELY-FILED OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE MORGANS NOVEMBER 17, 2009 OPINION AND ORDER Signed by District Judge Paul D Borman. (DGoo)
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part 31 Motion for Protective Order and denying 30 Motion for Protective Order - Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia M Morgan. (JJoh)
August 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CORRECTED MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable David H. Coar on 7/16/2009:(mb, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 8/5/2009.] Modified on 8/5/2009 (SSro).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Methode Electronics, Inc. v. Delphi Automotive Systems LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Delphi Automotive Systems LLC
Represented By: Binal Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Delphi Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy J. Rechtien - NOT SWORN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delphi Automotive Systems LLC
Represented By: Matthew P. Becker - NOT SWORN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marian, Incorporated
Represented By: Charles W. Shifley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Methode Electronics, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine P. Barecchia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Methode Electronics, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine P. Barecchia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?