Perfecting Church et al v. Royster, Carberry, Goldman & Associates, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cynthia Flowers, Marvin Winans and Perfecting Church
Defendant: Royster, Carberry, Goldman & Associates, Inc., Martin Royster, Shannon Stillo, Lloyd Banks and Toine Murphy
Case Number: 2:2009cv13493
Filed: September 3, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Majzoub
Presiding Judge: Rosen
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Securities Violation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 117 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' 96 MOTION for Sanctions. Signed by District Judge Gerald E. Rosen. (RGun)
September 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 104 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' 70 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Gerald E. Rosen. (RGun)
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 OPINION AND ORDER OF MONETARY JUDGMENT. Royster, Carberry, Goldman & Associates, Inc. terminated. Signed by District Judge Gerald E Rosen. (RGun)
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER REQUIRING SERVICE re 28 MOTION for Default Judgment as to All Defendants filed by Marvin Winans, Cynthia Flowers, Perfecting Church by Friday, June 25, 2010. Signed by District Judge Gerald E Rosen. (DGoo)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perfecting Church et al v. Royster, Carberry, Goldman & Associates, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Flowers
Represented By: Eric K. Shih
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Winans
Represented By: Charles E. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perfecting Church
Represented By: Eric K. Shih
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royster, Carberry, Goldman & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Royster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Stillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toine Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?