Santander Consumer USA Inc v. Superior Pontiac Buick GMC, Inc.
Plaintiff: Santander Consumer USA Inc
Defendant: Superior Pontiac Buick GMC, Inc.
Counter_claimant: Superior Pontiac Buick GMC, Inc.
Counter_defendant: Santander Consumer USA Inc
Case Number: 2:2010cv13181
Filed: August 11, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Nancy G Edmunds
Presiding Judge: R. Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 92 Motion for Summary Judgment; 109 Motion for Summary Judgment; and 120 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (CHem)
October 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER denying 124 Motion to Strike; denying 126 Motion to Strike; denying 132 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (CHem)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting 102 Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Strike Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (CHem)
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying without prejudice 10 Motion to Dismiss; granting 12 Motion for leave to amend its counterclaim. Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (CHem)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santander Consumer USA Inc v. Superior Pontiac Buick GMC, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Pontiac Buick GMC, Inc.
Represented By: Vickie S Brandt - NOT ADMITTED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santander Consumer USA Inc
Represented By: Donald E Hill - NOT ADMITTED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Superior Pontiac Buick GMC, Inc.
Represented By: Vickie S Brandt - NOT ADMITTED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Santander Consumer USA Inc
Represented By: Donald E Hill - NOT ADMITTED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?