Jordan v. Detroit, City of et al
Plaintiff: Jasmine Guy Jordan
Defendant: john doe, Detroit, City of and Wayne, County of
Case Number: 2:2011cv10153
Filed: January 20, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Robert H. Cleland
Presiding Judge: Virginia M. Morgan
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER denying 91 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER Terminating Defendant's 85 Motion to Enforce Settlement. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (Monda, H)
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 80 JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants Wayne County and John Does I and II and against Plaintiff Jasmine Jordan (LWag)
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 54 Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order; DENYING 64 Defendant Wayne County's Motion for Sanctions; DENYING AS MOOT 65 Defendant Wayne County's Motion for Protective Order; GRANTING 68 Wayne C ounty's Motion for Summary Judgment; DENYING 72 Defendant Wayne County's Motion to Strike; Directing Plaintiff to SHOW CASUE in writing by 7/16/2012, why summary judgment should not be entered on the conspiracy claim against Wayne County and the malicious prosecution claim against the two defendants identified only as John Does I and II and SUSPENDING the deadlines in the Court's August 15, 2011 Scheduling Order. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag) Modified on 6/29/2012 (LWag).
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER holding in abeyance 54 Motion for Protective Order; holding in abeyance 64 Motion for Sanctions; holding in abeyance 65 Motion for Protective Order; granting in part 66 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (Werner, L)
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATED ORDER Regarding Discovery 47 Motion to Compel. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Terminating as Moot 38 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and directing plaintiff and defendants to make Rule 26 disclosures and respond to requests by 10/18/2011. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
September 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting 27 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint; Denying as Moot 30 Motion to Dismiss; Denying as Moot 32 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
August 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER setting time for response as to 27 MOTION for Leave to File first amended complaint :( Responses due by 8/18/2011) Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 17 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 19 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
July 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER to Strike 21 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Jasmine Guy Jordan. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan v. Detroit, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: john doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detroit, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmine Guy Jordan
Represented By: Ronald D. Glotta
Represented By: D. Rick Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?