Shoppers Choice Supermarket, Inc. v. American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Shoppers Choice Supermarket, Inc.
Defendant: American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2011cv10998
Filed: March 14, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Robert H. Cleland
Presiding Judge: R. Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Setting Telephone Conference and Extending Dispositive Motion Deadline., ( Telephone Conference set for 2/27/2012 04:30 PM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 3/9/2012) Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 35 Motion requiring defendant to disburse funds. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Setting Telephone Conference and Extending Dispositive Motion Deadline., ( Telephone Conference set for 1/30/2012 10:00 AM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland, Dispositive Motion Cut-off reset for 2/14/2012) Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Terminating as Moot 28 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and CANCELLING January 25, 2012 Hearing. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Appointing Impartial Umpire for Appraisal of Plaintiff's Building Losses and Setting ( Telephone Conference for 12/5/2011 02:30 PM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland) Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shoppers Choice Supermarket, Inc. v. American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shoppers Choice Supermarket, Inc.
Represented By: Brian C. Grant
Represented By: Frank T. Aiello
Represented By: David J. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert E. Graziani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?