Essex Insurance Company v Detroit Bulk Storage, et al
Plaintiff: Essex Insurance Company
Defendant: The Morton Salt Company, UNITED STATES STEEL CORP., DETROIT BULK STORAGE and Praxair, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2011cv13277
Filed: July 27, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Paul D. Borman
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Hluchaniuk
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER DECLINING SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION AND DISMISSING CASE - Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
July 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 218 OPINION AND ORDER Denying as moot 184 Objections ; Granting 215 Motion for Summary Judgment and Dismissing DBS's Counter-claims Against Essex 55 . Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 143 REVISED 142 OPINION and ORDER (1) granting 124 Morton Salt's Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss its Counterclaim Against Essex and Dismissing Morton's Counterclaim With Prejudice if Morton Does Not Withdraw the Motion Within 14 Days of the Date of this Opinion and Order (2) denying Plaintiff's 128 Motion for Clarification (3) granting Morton Salt's 139 Motion for Extension of Discovery Deadline, and (4) Ordering that the Discovery Closure Date be Extended by 30 Days from the Date of Entry of this Opinion and Order. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (JOwe)
May 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 142 OPINION and ORDER (1) granting 124 Morton Salt's Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss its Counterclaim Against Essex and Dismissing Morton's Counterclaim With Prejudice if Morton Does Not Withdraw the Motion Within 14 Days of the Date of this O pinion and Order (2) denying Plaintiff's 128 Motion for Clarification (3) granting Morton Salt's 139 Motion for Extension of Discovery Deadline, and (4) Ordering that the Discovery Closure Date be Extended by 30 Days from the Date of Entry of this Opinion and Order. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (JOwe)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 131 OPINION and ORDER granting 119 Motion for voluntary dismissal of cross-claim against Detroit Bulk Storage, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DGoo)
December 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 113 OPINION and ORDER 1) Holding in abeyance plaintiff's motion to strike defendants' jury demand 87 ; 2) Holding in abeyance cross-defendant Praxair's motion to dismiss cross-plaintiff Morton Salt's cross claim 66 , 3) Holding in a beyance cross-defendant Praxair's motion to dismiss cross-plaintiff Detroit Bulk Storage's cross claim 67 , 4) Ordering discovery on plaintiff's admiralty liability under the Wharfinger Insurance Contract, and 5) Staying all other issues. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman (MBea)
May 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 OPINION and ORDER denying 11 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DGoo)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Essex Insurance Company v Detroit Bulk Storage, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Morton Salt Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES STEEL CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DETROIT BULK STORAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Praxair, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Essex Insurance Company
Represented By: Mary C. Rentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?