International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America et al v. Honeywell International Inc.
Plaintiff: |
International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America, Thomas Bode, Bruce Eaton, William Burns, Peter Antonellis and Larry Preston |
Defendant: |
Honeywell International Inc. |
Case Number: |
2:2011cv14036 |
Filed: |
September 15, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan |
Office: |
Detroit Office |
County: |
Wayne |
Presiding Judge: |
Denise Page Hood |
Presiding Judge: |
Laurie J. Michelson |
Nature of Suit: |
Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 |
Cause of Action: |
29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 4, 2023 |
Filing
212
ORDER Accepting Report and Recommendation 210 Regarding Defendant's Motion for ERISA Attorney Fees 202 . Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
|
April 5, 2022 |
Filing
200
ORDER Granting Defendant's Motion for Entry of Judgment 195 . Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
|
July 25, 2018 |
Filing
186
ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and a Permanent Injunction 168 , Denying as Moot Plaintiffs' Motion to File Supplemental Pleading 169 , Granting Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment 174 and Denying as Moot Plaintiff's Objection to Magistrate Judge's Order Denying Motion to Compel. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
|
March 29, 2018 |
Filing
161
ORDER Regarding Various Motions. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
|
August 6, 2013 |
Filing
47
ORDER denying Plaintiff's 46 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (Ciesla, C)
|
March 28, 2013 |
Filing
45
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 32 UAW's Motion to Dismiss Honeywell's Counterclaim. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (JOwe)
|
June 19, 2012 |
Filing
42
ORDER Certifying Class Action re: 10 . Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
|
March 9, 2012 |
Filing
25
ORDER granting in part 19 plaintiffs' motion for more definite statement and directing defendant to file an amended counterclaim. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America et al v. Honeywell International Inc. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America |
Represented By: |
John G. Adam |
Represented By: |
Stuart M. Israel |
Represented By: |
William A. Wertheimer, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Thomas Bode |
Represented By: |
John G. Adam |
Represented By: |
Stuart M. Israel |
Represented By: |
William A. Wertheimer, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Bruce Eaton |
Represented By: |
John G. Adam |
Represented By: |
Stuart M. Israel |
Represented By: |
William A. Wertheimer, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: William Burns |
Represented By: |
John G. Adam |
Represented By: |
Stuart M. Israel |
Represented By: |
William A. Wertheimer, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Peter Antonellis |
Represented By: |
John G. Adam |
Represented By: |
Stuart M. Israel |
Represented By: |
William A. Wertheimer, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Larry Preston |
Represented By: |
John G. Adam |
Represented By: |
Stuart M. Israel |
Represented By: |
William A. Wertheimer, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc. |
Represented By: |
Eugene Driker |
Represented By: |
Daniel M. Share |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?