Muslim Community Association of Ann Arbor v. Pittsfield, Charter Township of et al
Plaintiff: Muslim Community Association of Ann Arbor
Defendant: Pittsfield, Charter Township of, Township Board of Pittsfield Township, Mandy Grewal, Alan Israel, Patricia Scribner, Andrea Brown-Harrison, Stephanie Hunt, Gerald Krone and Michael Yi
Case Number: 2:2012cv10803
Filed: February 22, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Washtenaw
Presiding Judge: Patrick J. Duggan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 247 CONSENT JUDGMENT Between Plaintiff Muslim Community Association of Ann Arbor and Vicinity, d/b/a Michigan Islamic Academy and Defendant Pittsfield Charter Township. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 219 Motion for Reconsideration re 218 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion - Free, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Patrick J. Duggan. (MOre)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 218 OPINION AND ORDER granting 106 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 114 Motion to Limit Damages ; denying 121 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Without Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Patrick J. Duggan. (MOre)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 214 OPINION AND and ORDER re 172 Objection& RETURNING MATTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE GRAND, Signed by District Judge Patrick J. Duggan. (MOre)
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 51 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 52 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Patrick J. Duggan. (MOre)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muslim Community Association of Ann Arbor v. Pittsfield, Charter Township of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muslim Community Association of Ann Arbor
Represented By: Gadeir I. Abbas
Represented By: Lena F Masri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pittsfield, Charter Township of
Represented By: Thomas R. Meagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Township Board of Pittsfield Township
Represented By: Thomas R. Meagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mandy Grewal
Represented By: Thomas R. Meagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Israel
Represented By: Thomas R. Meagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Scribner
Represented By: Thomas R. Meagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Brown-Harrison
Represented By: Thomas R. Meagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Hunt
Represented By: Thomas R. Meagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Krone
Represented By: Thomas R. Meagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Yi
Represented By: Thomas R. Meagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?