United States of America v. Gladden et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Gregory A. Gladden, Veripi T. Gladden and Vivian Gladden
Case Number: 2:2012cv13849
Filed: August 30, 2012
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
Office: Detroit Office
County: Macomb
Presiding Judge: Gerald E. Rosen
Referring Judge: Mark A. Randon
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 18, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
March 24, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 18 Defendant's Motion to Stay; granting 21 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and setting telephone status conference for 4/22/16 at 10:30 a.m.. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
July 31, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE AND ORDER Directing Submission of 26(f)(3) Plan by 8/15/2014. (LWag)
July 21, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 13 Motion to Lift Stay of Proceedings. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Gladden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Laura Beckerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory A. Gladden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veripi T. Gladden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivian Gladden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?