Innovation Ventures, LLC v. Custom Nutrition Laboratories, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Innovation Ventures, LLC
Defendant: Custom Nutrition Laboratories, LLC, Nutrition Science Laboratories, LLC and Alan Jones
Case Number: 2:2012cv13850
Filed: August 30, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Oakland
Presiding Judge: Bernard A. Friedman
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Hluchaniuk
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 421 ORDER DENYING 406 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; DENYING 400 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING IN PART 403 Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate Cases; and DISMISSING Alan Jones as a Defendant with Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER for Parties to Submit a Case Management Plan and to Appear for Telephonic Status Conference. (TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 3/13/2019 10:00 AM before District Judge Terrence G. Berg.) Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 343 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 332 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, and granting in part and denying in part 328 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 337 ORDER GRANTING 317 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Defendant NSL's and Defendant Jones's Counterclaims. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER RESOLVING MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 219 OPINION AND ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 199 Nutrition Science's Motion for Summary Judgment and Denying Jones's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (DPar)
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER RESOLVING PENDING MOTIONS. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (Chubb, A)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 127 Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order and to Compel Discovery. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (Chubb, A)
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 111 OPINION AND ORDER granting 67 Motion to Quash Subpoenas, for a Protective Order, and for Bifurcation; denying 90 , 91 , 92 Motions to Compel; denying without prejudice 74 Motion for More Definite Statement; denying without prejudice 79 Motion to Dismiss. Joint discovery plan due by 5/31/2013. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (Chubb, A)
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER DENYING without Prejudice Plaintiff's 51 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (MWil)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Innovation Ventures, LLC v. Custom Nutrition Laboratories, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovation Ventures, LLC
Represented By: James J. Giszczak
Represented By: Timothy J. Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Custom Nutrition Laboratories, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nutrition Science Laboratories, LLC
Represented By: Baxter W. Banowsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?