CVG-SAB, LLC v. Facebook, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: CVG-SAB, LLC
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2012cv14521
Filed: October 12, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
County: Oakland
Presiding Judge: Gershwin A. Drain
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Nature of Suit: Trademark

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATED ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (CBet)
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATED ORDER re 35 extending time RELATING TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO ITS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION (Doc. # 30) Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (Bankston, T)
July 29, 2013 Filing 35 STIPULATION re 30 SEALED MOTION DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC.'S MOTION AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO ITS REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION by Facebook, Inc.., 34 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, by CVG-SAB, LLC (Avsec, Andrew)
July 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting 33 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 33 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 30 SEALED MOTION DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC.'S MOTION AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO ITS REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION by Fac Responses due by 7/29/2013. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (Bankston, T)
July 3, 2013 Filing 33 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 30 SEALED MOTION DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC.'S MOTION AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO ITS REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION by Facebook, Inc.. by All Parties. (Gabrielides, John) Modified on 7/9/2013 (PMil).[STIPULATED EXTENSION ON BRIEFING RELATING TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO ITS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION]
June 26, 2013 Filing 32 NOTICE of Correction re 31 Order Granting Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order Of January 15, 2013. (Bankston, T)
June 26, 2013 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Discovery due by 9/9/2013; Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 11/11/2013; Settlement Conference set for 9/16/13 before Magistrate Judge David Grand; Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/18/2014 11:00 AM before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain; Jury Trial set for 3/10/2014 09:00 AM before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain (Bankston, T)
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting 29 Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order of January 15, 2013. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (Bankston, T)
June 21, 2013 Filing 30 SEALED MOTION DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC.'S MOTION AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO ITS REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeffrey T. Norberg, # 2 Index of Exhibits, # 3 Exhibit A - CVG-SAB's Rsp to FB's 1st Set of RFPs (Nos. 1-13), # 4 Exhibit B - May 22 FB letter sent to CVG-SAB, # 5 Exhibit C - May 23 CVG-SAB response letter to FB's letter, # 6 Exhibit D - May 31 Ltr Avsec to Norberg encl disc re supplemental production of docs, # 7 Exhibit E - CVG0021500, 5-24-13 forwarding 10-8-12, # 8 Exhibit F - June 19 Email re Continued Failure to Produce Documents, # 9 Exhibit G - Logo, # 10 Exhibit H - Logo, # 11 Exhibit I - Logo, # 12 Exhibit J - Logo, # 13 Exhibit K - Excerpts of Rohit Dhawan testimony take June 6 2013) (Norberg, Jeffrey)
June 20, 2013 Filing 29 Joint MOTION Modification of Scheduling Order re 17 Scheduling Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines,,,, by All Parties. (Gabrielides, John)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATED ORDER REGARDING FACILITATION. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (Bankston, T)
June 17, 2013 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R. Nalevanko on behalf of Facebook, Inc.. (Nalevanko, Christopher)
June 12, 2013 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Dale M. Cendali on behalf of Facebook, Inc.. (Cendali, Dale)
June 12, 2013 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharre S. Lotfollahi on behalf of Facebook, Inc.. (Lotfollahi, Sharre)
June 12, 2013 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana M. Torres on behalf of Facebook, Inc.. (Torres, Diana)
June 12, 2013 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregg F. LoCascio on behalf of Facebook, Inc.. (LoCascio, Gregg)
June 3, 2013 Filing 22 WITNESS LIST by Facebook, Inc. (Norberg, Jeffrey)
June 3, 2013 Filing 21 WITNESS LIST by CVG-SAB, LLC (Avsec, Andrew)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (Bankston, T)
January 17, 2013 Filing 19 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Settlement Conference set for 9/12/2013 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. LOCATION: ANN ARBOR, MI (FMos)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING OTHER MATTERS to Magistrate Judge GRAND : Settlement Conference. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (Bankston, T)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 8/5/2013; Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand in September 2013; Pretrial Conference set for 11/12/2013 02:00 PM before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain; Jury Trial set for 12/3/2013 09:00 AM before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain Discovery due by 12/3/2013 Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (Refer to image for additional dates) (Bankston, T).
January 15, 2013 Minute Entry - Scheduling Conference held on 1/15/2013 before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (Bankston, T)
January 11, 2013 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey T. Norberg on behalf of Facebook, Inc.. (Norberg, Jeffrey)
January 8, 2013 Filing 15 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Avsec, Andrew)
December 10, 2012 Filing 14 ANSWER to Counterclaim with Affirmative Defenses by CVG-SAB, LLC. (Gabrielides, John)
December 10, 2012 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Avsec on behalf of CVG-SAB, LLC. (Avsec, Andrew)
December 7, 2012 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by John T. Gabrielides on behalf of CVG-SAB, LLC. (Gabrielides, John)
November 28, 2012 Filing 11 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by CVG-SAB, LLC (Beaupre, Jon)
November 15, 2012 Filing 10 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 1/15/2013 10:00 AM before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain (Bankston, T)
November 14, 2012 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM filed by Facebook, Inc. against CVG-SAB, LLC by Facebook, Inc.. (Kornfield, Susan)
November 14, 2012 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan M. Kornfield on behalf of Facebook, Inc.. (Kornfield, Susan)
October 24, 2012 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael N. Spink on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Spink, Michael)
October 24, 2012 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Facebook, Inc. served on 10/24/2012, answer due 11/14/2012. (Beaupre, Jon)
October 24, 2012 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon H. Beaupre on behalf of CVG-SAB, LLC. (Beaupre, Jon)
October 15, 2012 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Facebook, Inc.* (PMil)
October 15, 2012 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (PMil)
October 12, 2012 Filing 3 Trademark Report Sent To Washington (Cleland, James)
October 12, 2012 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by CVG-SAB, LLC (Cleland, James)
October 12, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by CVG-SAB, LLC against CVG-SAB, LLC. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-3761423 - Fee: $ 350. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F) (Cleland, James) Modified on 10/15/2012 (PMil).[COMPLAINT FILED AGAINST FACEBOOK, INC.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CVG-SAB, LLC v. Facebook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CVG-SAB, LLC
Represented By: Jon H. Beaupre
Represented By: James K. Cleland
Represented By: Michael N. Spink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?