Thomas v. Lighthouse of Oakland et al

Plaintiff: Randall Thomas
Defendant: Lighthouse of Oakland, Greg Sterns, Jonh Ziraldo, Judith Robinson and Latice Booker
Case Number: 2:2012cv15494
Filed: December 14, 2012
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
County: Wayne
Referring Judge: Michael J. Hluchaniuk
Presiding Judge: Victoria A. Roberts
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2016 151 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 146 Motion for Temporary Stay; Requiring Plaintiff's Compliance With Court's Order Regarding Joint Pretrial Order; and Notice to Plaintiff of Possible Sanctions SEE ORDER FOR DEADLINES. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (CPin)
October 6, 2016 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 136 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
July 12, 2016 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: providing documentation. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (CPin)
July 6, 2016 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding 123 Request filed by Randall Thomas. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
May 26, 2016 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 113 Plaintiff's for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
May 4, 2016 109 Opinion or Order of the Court CORRECTED ORDER re 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jonh Ziraldo, Greg Sterns, 99 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by LIGHTHOUSE COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT, Lighthouse of Oakland. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (CPin)
June 26, 2015 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 82 Motion to Compel Continuation of Plaintiff's Deposition. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (CPin)
May 8, 2015 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 76 Plaintiff's Objection and Discovery Matters. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Lighthouse of Oakland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lighthouse of Oakland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Sterns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonh Ziraldo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latice Booker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?