Naji et al v. Lincoln

Plaintiff: Loubna Naji and Amal N Aoum
Defendant: Andrew R Lincoln
Case Number: 2:2013cv10738
Filed: February 21, 2013
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Paul D. Borman
Referring Judge: Mona K. Majzoub
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 12, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 38 Motion to Set Aside 37 Order Dismissing Case. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
December 18, 2015 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE - Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
July 14, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 33 Report and Recommendation Denying without Prejudice 28 Motion to Dismiss,, filed by Andrew R Lincoln, Ordering Defendant to Submit a Bill of Costs and Precluding Plaintiffs from Introducing Certain Evidence in this Matter. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
November 24, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 26 Report and Recommendation, Awarding Expenses and Fees to Defendant. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
July 16, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 22 Report and Recommendation, Denying without Prejudice 15 Motion to Dismiss filed by Andrew R Lincoln. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
June 23, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Motion to Compel- Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (LBar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Naji et al v. Lincoln
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loubna Naji
Represented By: L Louie Andreopoulos
Represented By: David T. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amal N Aoum
Represented By: L Louie Andreopoulos
Represented By: David T. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew R Lincoln
Represented By: David M. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?