Guzall, et al v. Romulus, City of, et al
Plaintiff: Marianne Guzall and United States of America
Defendant: Romulus, City of, Alan R Lambert and Betsey Krampitz
Case Number: 2:2013cv11327
Filed: March 26, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Robert H. Cleland
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 189 OPINION and ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 187 Motion to Send Complete Record to the 6th Circuit Court of Appeals. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 179 OPINION and ORDER Granting Defendants' 153 154 171 Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 165 OPINION and ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 159 Motion for Reconsideration and/or Relief from the Court's August 23, 2016 Order. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 155 OPINION and ORDER Rejecting Plaintiff's 138 Objection to Magistrate Judge Grand's May 20, 2016 136 Order and Affirming Magistrate Judge Grand's Order. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (KJac)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 116 OPINION and ORDER Adopting Magistrate Judge Grand's 100 Report and Recommendation; Denying Plaintiff's 104 Objection to and/or Motion for Reconsideration of Magistrate Judge Grand's 99 Order; and Imposing Sanctions Against Plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 OPINION and ORDER Denying 59 Motion to Stay Proceedings, as to Defendant Alan R. Lambert. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 OPINION and ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 50 Motion for Return of Funds. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (Loury, R)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 OPINION and ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Relief From Order and/or Reconsideration and/or Clarification and Extending Stay, re 39 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (Loury, R)
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 AMENDED OPINION and ORDER Granting Defendants' Joint Motion to Disqualify Plaintiff's Counsel and Staying Case for Thirty Days. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (Loury, R)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 OPINION and ORDER Granting Defendants' 31 Joint Motion to Disqualify Plaintiff's Counsel. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (Loury, R)
May 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule and holding discovery in abeyance pending resolution of Defendants' motion.( Defendants' Motion to Disqualify Plaintiff's counsel due by 6/3/2014; Response due by 6/17/2014, Reply due by 6/24/2014) Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guzall, et al v. Romulus, City of, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marianne Guzall
Represented By: Raymond Guzall, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Peter A. Caplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Romulus, City of
Represented By: Carolyn M. Jereck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan R Lambert
Represented By: John J. Gillooly
Represented By: James E. Tamm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betsey Krampitz
Represented By: James E. Tamm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?