TRW Automotive U. S., L. L. C. v. INTERNATIONAL UNION, UNITED AUTOMOBILE, AEROSPACE AND AGRICULTURAL IMPLEMENT WORKERS OF AMERICA (UAW) et al
Plaintiff: TRW Automotive U. S., L. L. C.
Defendant: John Yasso, Ronald Gardner, INTERNATIONAL UNION, UNITED AUTOMOBILE, AEROSPACE AND AGRICULTURAL IMPLEMENT WORKERS OF AMERICA (UAW), Kim Taskila and Martin Lamer
Case Number: 2:2013cv12160
Filed: May 15, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Denise Page Hood
Referring Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 27 JUDGMENT in favor of plaintiff against defendant. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
August 6, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Denise Page Hood: Status Conference held on 8/6/2019. (LSau)
June 7, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference reset for 8/6/2019 04:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
May 28, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Status Conference set for 7/8/2019 02:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
March 28, 2019 Filing 25 MANDATE from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit as to #21 Notice of Appeal filed by TRW Automotive U. S., L. L. C. [Appeal Case Number 18-1160/1161] (SSch)
March 5, 2019 Filing 24 OPINION from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit re #21 Notice of Appeal filed by TRW Automotive U. S., L. L. C. [Appeal Case Number 18-1160/1161] (SKra)
April 11, 2018 Filing 23 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 11/13/2013. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Cheryl Daniel) (Number of Pages: 27) (Appeal Purposes) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 5/2/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/14/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/10/2018. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Daniel, C.)
February 14, 2018 Filing 22 Certificate of Service re #21 Notice of Appeal. (DWor)
February 14, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEAL by TRW Automotive U. S., L. L. C. re #19 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, #20 Judgment. Receipt No: 0645-6600792 - Fee: $ 505 - Fee Status: Fee Paid. (Mersol, Gregory)
January 16, 2018 Filing 20 JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment #12 , Granting Defendants' Motion to Affirm Arbitrator's Award #13 and Dismissing Plaintiff's Cause of Action. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
November 13, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Denise Page Hood: Motion Hearing held on 11/13/2013 re #13 MOTION for Summary Judgment and to confirm arbitration award filed by Kim Taskila, Ronald Gardner, John Yasso, Martin Lamer, INTERNATIONAL UNION, UNITED AUTOMOBILE, AEROSPACE AND AGRICULTURAL IMPLEMENT WORKERS OF AMERICA (UAW), #12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by TRW Automotive U. S., L. L. C. Disposition: TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT(Court Reporter Cheryl Warren Daniel) (LSau)
November 13, 2013 Filing 18 ADDENDUM re #13 MOTION for Summary Judgment and to confirm arbitration award by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Glendon award) (Wertheimer, William)
October 25, 2013 Filing 17 RESPONSE to #12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit UAW arbitration brief) (Wertheimer, William)
October 25, 2013 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #13 MOTION for Summary Judgment and to confirm arbitration award filed by All Plaintiffs. (Mersol, Gregory)
September 13, 2013 Filing 15 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #13 MOTION for Summary Judgment and to confirm arbitration award filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Arbitrator Glazer award) (Wertheimer, William)
September 13, 2013 Filing 14 NOTICE OF HEARING on #12 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #13 MOTION for Summary Judgment and to confirm arbitration award. Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2013 02:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
September 6, 2013 Filing 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment and to confirm arbitration award by All Defendants. (Wertheimer, William)
September 6, 2013 Filing 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment by TRW Automotive U. S., L. L. C.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit February 21, 2012, Declaration of Shelly Iacobelli, #3 Exhibit CBA Excerpts, #4 Exhibit Lamer Declaration, #5 Exhibit February 15, 2013 Declaration of Shelly Iacobelli, #6 Exhibit 2006 Announcement Letter, #7 Exhibit Arbitration Award, #8 Exhibit Arbitration Transcript, #9 Exhibit Declaration of Todd A. Dawson) (Mersol, Gregory)
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule and Notice of Hearing. Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2013 02:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (Ciesla, C)
August 6, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Denise Page Hood: Scheduling Conference held on 8/6/2013 (LSau)
July 2, 2013 Filing 10 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference reset for 8/6/2013 02:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (JOwe)
July 2, 2013 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Scheduling Conference on 07/29/2013 is Cancelled re #9 Notice to Appear (JOwe)
June 27, 2013 Filing 9 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 7/29/2013 03:15 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
June 20, 2013 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by All Defendants. (Wertheimer, William)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith and Magistrate Judge Michael J. Hluchaniuk in Flint to District Judge Denise Page Hood and Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub in Detroit. (SSch)
May 15, 2013 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
May 15, 2013 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued for *Ronald Gardner* (DWor)
May 15, 2013 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Kim Taskila* (DWor)
May 15, 2013 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *John Yasso* (DWor)
May 15, 2013 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Martin Lamer* (DWor)
May 15, 2013 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *INTERNATIONAL UNION, UNITED AUTOMOBILE, AEROSPACE AND AGRICULTURAL IMPLEMENT WORKERS OF AMERICA (UAW)* (DWor)
May 15, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT TO VACATE AN ARBITRATION AWARD filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-4096504 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Macomb - County Where Action Arose: Macomb - County of 1st Defendant: Macomb. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Eastern District of Michigan, 2:11-cv-14630, Judge Denise Page Hood] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2002 CBA, #2 Exhibit 2 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Lamer Declaration, #4 Exhibit 4 - Arbitration Decision) (Mersol, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TRW Automotive U. S., L. L. C. v. INTERNATIONAL UNION, UNITED AUTOMOBILE, AEROSPACE AND AGRICULTURAL IMPLEMENT WORKERS OF AMERICA (UAW) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Yasso
Represented By: William A. Wertheimer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Gardner
Represented By: William A. Wertheimer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL UNION, UNITED AUTOMOBILE, AEROSPACE AND AGRICULTURAL IMPLEMENT WORKERS OF AMERICA (UAW)
Represented By: William A. Wertheimer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Taskila
Represented By: William A. Wertheimer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Lamer
Represented By: William A. Wertheimer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRW Automotive U. S., L. L. C.
Represented By: Gregory V. Mersol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?