Daneshvar v. Kipke et al

Plaintiff: Eugene D Daneshvar
Defendant: Daryl R Kipke and Neuronexus Technologies, Inc.
Counter_claimant: Neuronexus Technologies, Inc. and Daryl R Kipke
Counter_defendant: Eugene D Daneshvar
Case Number: 2:2013cv13096
Filed: July 18, 2013
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
County: Washtenaw
Referring Judge: Mark A. Randon
Presiding Judge: Stephen J. Murphy
Nature of Suit: Patent

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 30, 2015 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 49 Motion for Sanctions; Denying without prejudice 64 Motion for Summary Judgment; Denying without prejudice 65 Motion for Summary Judgment; Denying as moot 74 Motion to Strike; Adopting 88 Report and Recommendation; Overruled 99 Motion for Reconsideration; and the parties shall mediate with Dennis Barnes no later than 2/5/2016.. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (CCoh)
November 25, 2015 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 81 Motion to Strike--Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (MWil) (Main Document 105 replaced on 11/25/2015) (MWil).
October 28, 2015 97 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER re: 81 MOTION to Strike Expert Testimony of Eugene D. Daneshvar filed by Daryl R Kipke, Neuronexus Technologies, Inc.., ( Supplemental statement of compliance due by 11/12/2015)--Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (MWil)
October 16, 2015 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Deeming RESOLVED in part and GRANTING in part Defendants' 77 Motion to Compel--Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (MWil)
October 2, 2015 83 Opinion or Order of the Court BRIEFING SCHEDULE and Notice of Hearing re: 49 MOTION for Sanctions , 77 MOTION to Compel , 52 MOTION to Compel :( Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2015 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti)--Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (MWil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daneshvar v. Kipke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene D Daneshvar
Represented By: James M. Pelland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daryl R Kipke
Represented By: Edward J. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neuronexus Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Edward J. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Neuronexus Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Edward J. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Daryl R Kipke
Represented By: Edward J. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Eugene D Daneshvar
Represented By: James M. Pelland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?