Choon's Design, LLC v. Zenacon, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Choon's Design, LLC
Defendant: Zenacon, LLC and Steven Verona
Case Number: 2:2013cv13568
Filed: August 19, 2013
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
Office: Detroit Office
County: Oakland
Presiding Judge: Patrick J. Duggan
Referring Judge: R. Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 18, 2015 161 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER Construing Patent Claim Terms: Granting in Part and Denying in Part 155 , 156 , and 157 MOTIONS by Choon's Design, LLC and Idea Village. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (JJoh)
February 9, 2015 126 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER Denying 89 MOTION to Dismiss COUNTS I - VI of Plaintiffs Fourth Amended Complaint - Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (JJoh)
August 28, 2014 97 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 25 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (Ciesla, C)
April 10, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 51 Motion to Reassign Case.. Signed by District Judge Patrick J. Duggan. (MOre)
February 27, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 28 Motion for Protective Order, Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (MWil)
February 25, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING 25 MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by Toys R Us - Delaware, Inc.., Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (MWil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Choon's Design, LLC v. Zenacon, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Choon's Design, LLC
Represented By: Brian S. Tobin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zenacon, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Verona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?