Peeples et al v. Detroit, City of et al
Plaintiff: Erick Peeples, Perry Anderson, Vincent Fields, Arnold Freeman, Ralph Glenn, Jr., Jamal Jennings, Lee Jones, Anthony McCloud, Exander Poe, David Rivera and Samuel Shack
Defendant: Detroit, City of and International Association of Firefighters Local 344
Case Number: 2:2013cv13858
Filed: September 10, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Sean F. Cox
Presiding Judge: Mark A. Randon
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 OPINION AND ORDER Regarding Costs. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (BSau)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 147 OPINION AND ORDER Denying 142 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 136 OPINION and ORDER Granting 122 MOTION for Summary Judgment Post-Remand and Denying Request for Sanctions/Attorney Fees Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (EKar)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER Sustaining 97 Defendant DFFA's Objections to Clerk's Taxed Bill of Costs (R95), and Overruling 96 Plaintiff's Objections to DFFA Bill of Costs. Motions terminated: 100 MOTION Defendant DFFAs Motion Objecting to the Clerk's Reduction (R95). Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 OPINION AND ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 54 Motion for Summary Judgment; and Granting in Part and Denying in Part 56 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Granting 25 Motion for Protective Order; Denying 31 Motion to Compel Discovery - Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (LBar)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peeples et al v. Detroit, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erick Peeples
Represented By: Bruce B. Elfvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry Anderson
Represented By: Bruce B. Elfvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Fields
Represented By: Bruce B. Elfvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnold Freeman
Represented By: Bruce B. Elfvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Glenn, Jr.
Represented By: Bruce B. Elfvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamal Jennings
Represented By: Bruce B. Elfvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Jones
Represented By: Bruce B. Elfvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony McCloud
Represented By: Bruce B. Elfvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Exander Poe
Represented By: Bruce B. Elfvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Rivera
Represented By: Bruce B. Elfvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Shack
Represented By: Bruce B. Elfvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detroit, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Association of Firefighters Local 344
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?