Joseph v. Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Dixon T Joseph
Defendant: Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company
Case Number: 2:2013cv14340
Filed: October 14, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Genesee
Presiding Judge: Paul J. Komives
Presiding Judge: Stephen J. Murphy
Nature of Suit: Federal Employers Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 244 OPINION and ORDER Denying Defendant's 237 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 219 OPINION and ORDER Resolving Motions in Limine. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 216 OPINION and ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 211 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant's 68 Motion to Compel. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joseph v. Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dixon T Joseph
Represented By: Arvin J. Pearlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?