AES-Apex Employer Services, Inc. et al v. Rotondo et al

Plaintiff: AES-Apex Employer Services, Inc. and AES-Apex Employer Solutions, Inc.
Defendant: Dino Rotondo, Richard Mark and United States Department of Treasury Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 2:2013cv14519
Filed: October 29, 2013
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
Office: Detroit Office
County: Oakland
Presiding Judge: Robert H. Cleland
Referring Judge: David R. Grand
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 28:2410
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 23, 2016 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION (1) SUSTAINING IN PART AND OVERRULING IN PART OBJECTIONS TO THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, (2) ADOPTING IN PART AND REJECTING IN PART THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, (3) GRANTING THE IRS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, (4) DENYING AKOUR I INVESTMENTS, LLCS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, (4) GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO INTERPLEAD FUNDS, FOR DISMISSAL, AND FOR COSTS AND ATTORNEY FEES, AND (5) DISMISSING AKOURI INVESTMENTS LLCs CROSS-CLAIM Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
January 6, 2016 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING [Dkt. #83] REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; TERMINATING AS MOOT, the parties' Objections [Dkt. ##84, 85} AND ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge David R. Grand: For a Report and Recommendation re: 98 MOTION Motion for Post Judgment Relief filed by Akouri Investments, LLC, and REFERRING BACK 45 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Akouri Investments, LLC, 44 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United States Depart ment of Treasury Internal Revenue Service, 46 MOTION to Dismiss filed by AES-Apex Employer Services, Inc., 64 MOTION to Strike 58 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Akouri Investments, LLC to either reissue the report and recommendation or alter the report and recommendation in response to the filed objections. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
July 24, 2015 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 76 Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
May 27, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER Granting 23 MOTION to Set Aside 17 Clerks Entry of Judgment by Default Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (EBut)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AES-Apex Employer Services, Inc. et al v. Rotondo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AES-Apex Employer Services, Inc.
Represented By: David B. Timmis(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AES-Apex Employer Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: David B. Timmis(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dino Rotondo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Mark
Represented By: Bradley S. Defoe
Represented By: Eric Nemeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Treasury Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Patrick B. Gushue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?