Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters
Defendant: Glenn Smith, Laura Smith and Stacey Adkins
Case Number: 2:2013cv14566
Filed: November 1, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Denise Page Hood
Presiding Judge: Mark A. Randon
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 57 Motion for Default Judgment as to Defendant Glenn Smith. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE OF HEARING on Plaintiff's 57 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Glenn Smith and ORDER to Appear for Status Conference. (Motion Hearing and Status Conference set for 3/8/2017 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman.) Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Continuing Limited Stay of Discovery of Defendant Glenn Smith. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Continuing Limited Stay of Discovery of Defendant Glenn Smith. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Continuing Limited Stay of Discovery of Defendant Glenn Smith. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER STAYING CASE in All Respects. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (Monda, H)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 26 Exparte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (LWag)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order 11 . Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters
Represented By: Bryan M. Beckerman
Represented By: John I. Tesija
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacey Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?