October 24, 2019 |
Filing
267
ORDER DENYING MOTIONS FOR RECONSIDERATION [DOCS. 263, 264]. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
|
September 18, 2019 |
Filing
261
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (ECF No. 239) AND DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (ECF No. 243)AND DISMISSING CASE. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
|
September 5, 2019 |
Filing
260
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS FOR FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, et al (Doc. 252) EMERGENCY INJUNCTION (Doc. 257) AND TO SUPPLEMENT (Doc. 259) AND STAYING FURTHER MOTIONS UNTIL PENDING MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ARE RESOLVED. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
|
August 13, 2019 |
Filing
251
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO ADD NEWLY OBTAINED AND OR DISCOVERED EVIDENCE AND FUTURE SAFETY (Doc. 247). Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
|
April 18, 2019 |
Filing
240
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS (Doc. 236) AND DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL (Doc. 237. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
|
August 9, 2018 |
Filing
220
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXPEDITE TRIAL OR SUPERVISED ARBITRATION (Doc. 214) AND DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL AND OTHER RELIEF (Doc. 219). Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
|
February 15, 2018 |
Filing
212
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION (Doc. 211) AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REOPEN DISCOVERY & AMEND WITNESS LIST DUE TO NEWLY DISCOVERED EVIDENCE (Doc. 205) Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
|
July 27, 2017 |
Filing
200
ORDER OVERRULING PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS (Doc. 199) AND ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGES ORDERS (Docs. 191, 194) AND ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGES REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION (Doc. 192) Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
|
June 15, 2017 |
Filing
194
ORDER Denying 175 Motion to Enforce/Compel Discovery Inspection and Contempt of Court by Non-Party Correction Personnel and Denying 178 Motion to Expedite Hearing on Injunction and Motion to Compel Discovery - Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (LBar)
|
June 6, 2017 |
Filing
191
ORDER Denying 170 Motion to Appoint Counsel; 173 Motion to Strike Improper Response & Request for Admonishment/Sanctions; 183 Motion to Compel Responses to Interrogatories/Discovery and for Contempt Fines Fees and Costs; 186 Motion to Provide Copies of Docket 160 at State Expense, and 188 Motion to Compel/Order Discovery; and Granting 181 Motion for Leave to Depose Prisoner Witnesses - Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (LBar)
|
November 30, 2016 |
Filing
168
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION (Doc. 166) AND GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS MOTION NUNC PRO TUNC Doc. 141 TO ADOPT AMENDED COMPLAINT (Doc. 149)AND DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS FOR SANCTIONS (Docs. 150, 152)ANDDENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS (Doc. 153) AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Doc. 158) Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
|
October 20, 2016 |
Filing
165
ORDER withdrawing 134 Motion for an Emergency Hearing; granting 136 Motion to Seal Rulings; withdrawing 143 Motion of Correction to Motion for Emergency Hearing; denying 145 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order; withdrawing 146 Emergency Motion for Immediate Temporary Injunction to Prevent Physical Injury or Death; withdrawing 148 Motion in Support of Motion to Amend and Proof of Ongoing Imminent Danger; granting in part and denying in part 162 Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss doc, 134, 143, 146, 148, 162 - Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (LBar)
|
April 1, 2016 |
Filing
133
ORDER Granting 126 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for the Plaintiff; Denying 128 Motion to Re-File Motion to Amend Complaint and Response to Counsel's Motion to Withdraw, and 128 Taking Judicial Notice of Evidence Presented for In Camera Review - Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (LBar)
|
March 11, 2016 |
Filing
131
ORDER Reserving Ruling on 126 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney and re 128 MOTION to Re-File Motion to Amend Complaint and Response to Counsel's Motion to Withdraw and for In Camera Review of Discovery Documents - Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (LBar)
|
August 13, 2015 |
Filing
119
ORDER granting in part 99 Motion ; denying 106 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 107 Motion for Immediate Hearing; denying 108 Motion to Expedite ; denying 109 Motion for Emergency Hearing on Injunctive Relief due to Imminent Danger ; granting in part 114 Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Petition for Immediate Injunction ; denying 115 Motion to Compel; denying 117 Motion to Proceed without Counsel with Supervised Discovery and Deposition - Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (LBar)
|
February 27, 2015 |
Filing
101
Order Adopting 98 Report and Recommendation and Denying Without Prejudice Plaintiff's 82 Motion for Summary Judgment and Denying Plaintiff's 94 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (SCha)
|
January 14, 2015 |
Filing
97
ORDER granting 66 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying 86 Motion for Discovery; granting 87 Motion to Take Deposition; denying 88 Motion for Discovery; and granting in part and denying in part 92 Motion to Compel - Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (LBar)
|
June 24, 2014 |
Filing
73
Order Adopting 56 Report and Recommendation and Overruling Plaintiff's 58 Objections and Disposing of Pending Motions (Docs. 22 , 27 , 47 , 48 , 49 , 53 , 57 , 59 , 63 , 64 , 67 ). Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (SCha)
|
May 7, 2014 |
Filing
55
ORDER denying 43 Second Motion to Amend Complaint - Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (LBar)
|
April 22, 2014 |
Filing
44
Order Adopting 31 Report and Recommendation and Granting Plaintiff's 3 Motion for Immediate Temporary Injunction and Denying as Moot Plaintiff's 10 Motion for Expedited Review of Immediate Restraining Order and Denying Plaintiff's 19 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (SCha)
|
March 25, 2014 |
Filing
30
ORDER granting 13 Motion to Amend - Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (LBar)
|