Annabel v. Frost et al
Plaintiff: Robert Annabel
Defendant: Frost, Steven Kindinger, S Campbell, J Eaton and K McConnell
Case Number: 2:2014cv10244
Filed: January 17, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Macomb
Presiding Judge: Arthur J. Tarnow
Presiding Judge: R. Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S 244 Motion to Renew Motions to Compel- Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S 245 Motion to Renew Motion to Compel Sixteenth Set of Interrogatories - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER denying 210 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 211 Motion ; adopting in part 232 Report and Recommendation. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S 200 Motion for Reconsideration - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 195 OPINION and ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S 188 MOTION for Appointment of an Expert Witness - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFF'S 120 Motion to Compel- Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT PLAINTIFF'S 122 Motion to Compel Discovery - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER Overruling and Sustaining in Part 117 Objection to 126 Order on Motion for Recusal, 106 Order on Motion to Take Deposition, 105 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, Objection 118 , and 133 Objection by Robert Annabel re 108 Order on Motion to Strike and Provisionally Granting 80 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER denying 110 Motion for TRO; adopting 128 Report and Recommendation. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S 121 Motion for Protective Order - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie)
September 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 134 OPINION AND ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 73 and 84 Motions to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (HMon)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER adopting in part 107 Report and Recommendation; overruling 114 Objections; denying 69 Motion for TRO; denying 91 Motion for District Judge to Issue Directive Order to Magistrate Judge. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S 116 Motion to Strike Clerk's Entry of Notice of Appeal - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S 115 Motion for Recusal - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie)
July 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S 85 Motion to Strike - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' 83 Motion to Take Deposition from Robert Annabel - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Adopting 38 Report and Recommendation, Granting 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, denying 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment as Moot, denying 54 MOTION to Amend Objection as Moot, Overrulin g 57 Objection, Granting 50 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Robert Annabel and Denying 55 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER adopting 38 Report and Recommendation; finding as moot 15 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 28 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER DENYING 39 Motion for Reconsideration re 35 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct filed by Robert Annabel. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (Ciesla, C)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S 22 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (Ciesla, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Annabel v. Frost et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Annabel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Kindinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K McConnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?