Choon's Design LLC v. Tristar Products, Inc.
Plaintiff: Choon's Design LLC
Defendant: Tristar Products, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2014cv10848
Filed: February 24, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Oakland
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Presiding Judge: Victoria A. Roberts
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER: (1) Granting 186 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; and (2) Dismissing the Case. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER: (1) Reopening Case; (2) Lifting Stay; (3) Dismissing Plaintiff's Claims for Infringement of the '565 Patent; and (4) Setting Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (see image for details and dates) (LVer)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER: (1) Granting Tristar's Motion to Stay 179 ; (2) Denying As Moot Tristar's Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 176 and Administratively Closing Case Pending Appeal in Idea Village. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 171 Motion to Strike Defendant's Supplemental Contentions. Status Conference set for 5/31/2018 at 3:30 PM before District Judge Victoria A. Roberts (Chambers 1067). Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER re 167 Letter. ( TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 3/20/2018 03:30 PM before District Judge Victoria A. Roberts) Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (CPin)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 165 SECOND ORDER ON CLAIM CONSTRUCTION. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER denying 146 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (CPin)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part 97 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER Denying 95 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment of Literal Infringement of Claims 9 and 14 of the '565 Patent. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER denying 86 Motion to Seal; granting 87 Motion to Compel. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (CPin)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Order on Claim Construction. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting 19 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and Denying 23 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and for Sanctions. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Denying 12 Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Choon's Design LLC v. Tristar Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Choon's Design LLC
Represented By: Steven C. Susser
Represented By: Brian S. Tobin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tristar Products, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas J. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?