Johannes v. Heyns et al

Plaintiff: Robert Johannes
Defendant: Daniel H. Heyns and Dalton Sanders
Case Number: 2:2014cv11691
Filed: April 28, 2014
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
Office: Detroit Office
County: Muskegon
Referring Judge: Mona K. Majzoub
Presiding Judge: Laurie J. Michelson
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 31, 2016 158 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER ADOPTING IN PART REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 132 re MOTION for Summary Judgment 116 , AND Vacating Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge 15 . Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (JCur)
March 17, 2016 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 117 Report and Recommendation, and Granting 77 Motion to Dismiss - Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (JJoh)
November 6, 2015 115 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER re 114 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Defendants' Summary Judgment Brief - Granted, 61 MOTION for Leave to File More Than One Summary Judgment Motion Pursuant to E.D. Mich L.R. 7.1(b) - Grante d, 107 MOTION for Status Conference - Granted, and 60 MOTION for Order to Modify Scheduling Order - Granted in Part; AND Setting ( Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/13/2015 and Status Conference set for 1/26/2016 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub) Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (JJoh)
September 25, 2015 105 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 38 MOTION to Certify Class AND 40 MOTION re 18 Scheduling Order to modify Allowing More Admissions - Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (JJoh)
January 29, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 Motion to Amend Complaint and granting in part and denying in part 19 Motion to Compel - Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (LBar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johannes v. Heyns et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Johannes
Represented By: Robert Gittleman
Represented By: Daniel E. Manville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel H. Heyns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dalton Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?