Hodges v. Corizon et al
Plaintiff: Shawn Hodges
Defendant: Corizon, corizon of michigan, Prison Health Services, Inc., Harriet A. Squier, M.D., Aster Berhane, M.D., Joshua A. Buskirk, P.A., Daniel A. Heyns and George Pramstaller
Case Number: 2:2014cv11837
Filed: May 7, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Ann Arbor Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Presiding Judge: John Corbett O'Meara
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting 60 Motion to Preclude Expert Testimony. Signed by District Judge John Corbett O'Meara. (WBar)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Adopting 58 Report and Recommendation re 46 Motion for Summary Judgment, Signed by District Judge John Corbett O'Meara. (WBar)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Adopting 56 Report and Recommendation re 47 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Daniel A. Heyns, George Pramstaller, Signed by District Judge John Corbett O'Meara. (WBar)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Adopting 28 Report and Recommendation re 14 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Joshua A. Buskirk, P.A., Harriet A. Squier, M.D., corizon of michigan, Corizon, Aster Berhane, M.D., Signed by District Judge John Corbett O'Meara. (WBar)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hodges v. Corizon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Hodges
Represented By: Thomas H. Blaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon
Represented By: Ronald W. Chapman
Represented By: Carly A. Van Thomme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: corizon of michigan
Represented By: Ronald W. Chapman
Represented By: Carly A. Van Thomme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prison Health Services, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald W. Chapman
Represented By: Carly A. Van Thomme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harriet A. Squier, M.D.
Represented By: Ronald W. Chapman
Represented By: Carly A. Van Thomme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aster Berhane, M.D.
Represented By: Ronald W. Chapman
Represented By: Carly A. Van Thomme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua A. Buskirk, P.A.
Represented By: Ronald W. Chapman
Represented By: Carly A. Van Thomme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel A. Heyns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Pramstaller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?