Kerrigan et al v. VISALUS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Kerrigan, Lori Mikovich and Ryan M Valli
Defendant: VISALUS, INC., Ropart Asset Management Fund, LLC, Ropart Asset Management Fund II, LLC, Visalus Holdings, LLC, Mojos Legacy, LLC, Fragmob, LLC, iCentris, Inc., Freedom Legacy, LLC, Wealth Builder International, Inc., Residual Marketing, Inc., Jaketrz, Inc., Insider Corporate and Partnership Defendant Company Does 1-10, Nick Sarnicola, Robert Goergen, Sr., Todd Goergen, Ryan Blair, Blake Mallen, Frank Varon, Kyle Pacetti, Jr., Jake Trzcinski, Michael Craig, Lavon Craig, Timothy Kirkland, Holley Kirkland, Joshua Jackson, Aaron Fortner, Rachel Jackson, Tara Wilson, Anthony Lucero, Rhonda Lucero, Individual Defendant John Does 1-10, Jason O'Toole and Lori Petrilli
Case Number: 2:2014cv12693
Filed: July 9, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Oakland
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Presiding Judge: Matthew F. Leitman
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER Granting Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Final Judgment. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER Granting 228 MOTION Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. (Fairness Hearing set for 10/1/2019 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman.) Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER Denying Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' 125 Motion to Exclude E. Allen Jacobs' Expert Reports. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER Requiring Mediation. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER on Status Conference. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER (1) Granting Defendants' 168 , 169 and 170 Motions to Dismiss, (2) Allowing Plaintiffs to File a Fourth Amended Complaint, and (3) Terminating as Moot Plaintiffs' 179 Motion to File a Corrected Third Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER Denying Defendants' 185 Motion to Strike Class Allegations. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER on Status Conference. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER to Attend Telephonic Scheduling Conference and Notice of Requirements for Submission of Discovery Plan. (TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference set for 5/2/2016 at 10:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR IMPORTANT DEADLINES**) Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 OPINION AND ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' 61 and 62 Motions to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 OPINION AND ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' 35 , 36 and 37 Motions to Dismiss and Directing Plaintiffs to File an Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kerrigan et al v. VISALUS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Kerrigan
Represented By: Andrew Kochanowski
Represented By: Matthew J.M. Prebeg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Mikovich
Represented By: Andrew Kochanowski
Represented By: Matthew J.M. Prebeg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan M Valli
Represented By: Andrew Kochanowski
Represented By: Matthew J.M. Prebeg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VISALUS, INC.
Represented By: Nicholas B Gorga
Represented By: Mitra Jafary-Hariri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ropart Asset Management Fund, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ropart Asset Management Fund II, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visalus Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas B Gorga
Represented By: Mitra Jafary-Hariri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mojos Legacy, LLC
Represented By: Gregory M. Krause
Represented By: Barry M. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fragmob, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: iCentris, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freedom Legacy, LLC
Represented By: Gregory M. Krause
Represented By: Barry M. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wealth Builder International, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory M. Krause
Represented By: Barry M. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residual Marketing, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory M. Krause
Represented By: Barry M. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaketrz, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory M. Krause
Represented By: Barry M. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insider Corporate and Partnership Defendant Company Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Sarnicola
Represented By: Gregory M. Krause
Represented By: Barry M. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Goergen, Sr.
Represented By: Nicholas B Gorga
Represented By: Mitra Jafary-Hariri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Goergen
Represented By: Nicholas B Gorga
Represented By: Mitra Jafary-Hariri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Blair
Represented By: Nicholas B Gorga
Represented By: Mitra Jafary-Hariri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake Mallen
Represented By: Nicholas B Gorga
Represented By: Mitra Jafary-Hariri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Varon
Represented By: Gregory M. Krause
Represented By: Barry M. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Pacetti, Jr.
Represented By: Gregory M. Krause
Represented By: Barry M. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jake Trzcinski
Represented By: Gregory M. Krause
Represented By: Barry M. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Craig
Represented By: Gregory M. Krause
Represented By: Barry M. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lavon Craig
Represented By: Gregory M. Krause
Represented By: Barry M. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Kirkland
Represented By: Gregory M. Krause
Represented By: Barry M. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holley Kirkland
Represented By: Gregory M. Krause
Represented By: Barry M. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Jackson
Represented By: Gregory M. Krause
Represented By: Barry M. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Fortner
Represented By: Gregory M. Krause
Represented By: Barry M. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Jackson
Represented By: Gregory M. Krause
Represented By: Barry M. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tara Wilson
Represented By: Gregory M. Krause
Represented By: Barry M. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Lucero
Represented By: Gregory M. Krause
Represented By: Barry M. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda Lucero
Represented By: Gregory M. Krause
Represented By: Barry M. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Individual Defendant John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason O'Toole
Represented By: Gregory M. Krause
Represented By: Barry M. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Petrilli
Represented By: Gregory M. Krause
Represented By: Barry M. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?