Johnson v. Fifth Third Bank
Plaintiff: Sheila Johnson
Defendant: Fifth Third Bank
Case Number: 2:2014cv13121
Filed: August 13, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Gerald E Rosen
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2017 Filing 27 MANDATE from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit as to #26 Appeal Order/Opinion/Judgment, #24 Notice of Appeal filed by Sheila Johnson [Appeal Case Number 16-1111] (Ahmed, N)
April 5, 2017 Filing 26 OPINION from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit re #24 Notice of Appeal filed by Sheila Johnson [Appeal Case Number 16-1111] (Ahmed, N) Modified on 5/1/2017 (Ahmed, N).
February 1, 2016 Filing 25 Certificate of Service re #24 Notice of Appeal. (DWor)
January 29, 2016 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Sheila Johnson re #23 Judgment, #22 Memorandum Opinion & Order. Receipt No: 0645-5530411 - Fee: $ 505 - Fee Status: Fee Paid. (Mastromarco, Victor)
December 30, 2015 Filing 23 JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Gerald E. Rosen. (SBur)
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 OPINION and ORDER Regarding Defendants' #18 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Gerald E. Rosen. (SBur)
May 12, 2015 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Final Pretrial Conference on 06/25/2015 and Bench Trial on 07/28/2015 are Cancelled (JOwe)
April 7, 2015 Filing 21 REPLY to Response re #18 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Fifth Third Bank. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Engstrom deposition testimony, #3 Exhibit 2 - March 4, 2014 email, #4 Exhibit 3 - Second Affidavit of Jennifer Polakoff, #5 Exhibit 4 - David Engstrom Affidavit, #6 Exhibit 5 - Sheila Johnson deposition testimony, #7 Exhibit 6 - Lee Hotchkiss testimony, #8 Exhibit 7 - Cichewicz v. UNOVA Industrial Automotive Sys., 92 Fed. Appx. 215 (6th Cir. 2004)) (Eble, Louis)
March 24, 2015 Filing 20 RESPONSE to #18 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Sheila Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1. Johnson Deposition, #3 Exhibit 2. 10/17/12 Counseling, #4 Exhibit 3. 06/17/13 Counseling, #5 Exhibit 4. 07/09/13 Counseling, #6 Exhibit 5. 07/23/13 Sissen Notes, #7 Exhibit 6. 03/04/14 Email, #8 Exhibit 7. 2013 Performance Management, #9 Exhibit 8. Engstrom Deposition, #10 Exhibit 9. Hotchkiss Deposition, #11 Exhibit 10. Scorsone v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.) (Kelly, Kevin)
March 2, 2015 Filing 19 Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re #18 MOTION for Summary Judgment (JOwe)
March 2, 2015 Filing 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Fifth Third Bank. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiffs Deposition testimony, #3 Exhibit 2 - October 4, 2011 counseling, #4 Exhibit 3 - June 13, 2012 counseling, #5 Exhibit 4 - Affidavit of Bobbie Jo Lucas, #6 Exhibit 5 - October 17, 2012 counseling, #7 Exhibit 6 - June 17, 2013 counseling, #8 Exhibit 7 - July 9, 2013 counseling, #9 Exhibit 8 - Engstroms deposition testimony, #10 Exhibit 9 - Affidavit of Mary Sissen, #11 Exhibit 10 - July 23, 2013, Record of Conversation., #12 Exhibit 11 - Affidavit of Jennifer Polakoff, #13 Exhibit 12 - February 13, 2014 email correspondence from Jennifer Polakoff, #14 Exhibit 13 - Hotckiss deposition testimony, #15 Exhibit 14 - 2013 Performance Management Evaluation, #16 Exhibit 15 - Polakoffs April 29, 2014 handwritten notes, #17 Exhibit 16 - 2014 Trending Report, #18 Exhibit 17 - Krumheuer v. Gab Robins North America, Inc., 484 Fed. Appx. 1, (6th Cir. 2012)) (Eble, Louis)
February 13, 2015 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fifth Third Bank of Defendant's Final Trial Witness List and Expert Witness List (Eble, Louis)
January 16, 2015 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fifth Third Bank of Defendant's Preliminary Trial Witness List and Expert Witness List (Eble, Louis)
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying Defendant's #12 Motion to Compel Discovery. Signed by District Judge Gerald E. Rosen. (JOwe)
December 5, 2014 Filing 14 REPLY to Response re #12 Second MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs Responses to Defendants First Request for Production of Documents filed by Fifth Third Bank. (Eble, Louis)
December 4, 2014 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #12 Second MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs Responses to Defendants First Request for Production of Documents filed by Sheila Johnson. (Kelly, Kevin)
November 20, 2014 Filing 12 Second MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs Responses to Defendants First Request for Production of Documents by Fifth Third Bank. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Defendants First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff with Certificate of Service, and Defendants First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff with Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit B - Correspondence of October 22, 2014, #4 Exhibit C - Plaintiffs Response to Defendants First Requests for Production of Documents, #5 Exhibit D - Two letters sent to Plaintiffs Counsel on 11/14/14) (Eble, Louis)
November 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting Defendant's #10 Motion to Compelm Discovery. Signed by District Judge Gerald E. Rosen. (JOwe)
October 31, 2014 Filing 10 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Responses to First Set of Interrogatories, First Request for Production of Documents and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures by Fifth Third Bank. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Defendants First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff with Certificate of Service, and Defendants First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff with Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit B - Correspondence of October 22, 2014, #4 Exhibit C - Gonzalez v. Ohio Casualty Ins. Co.) (Eble, Louis)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/30/2015 Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 3/2/2015 Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/25/2015 10:00 AM before District Judge Gerald E. Rosen Bench Trial set for 7/28/2015 09:00 AM before District Judge Gerald E. Rosen Signed by District Judge Gerald E. Rosen. (Refer to image for additional dates) (JOwe)
September 30, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Gerald E. Rosen: Scheduling Conference held on 9/30/2014 (JOwe)
September 16, 2014 Filing 8 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 9/30/2014 10:00 AM before District Judge Gerald E. Rosen (JOwe)
September 15, 2014 Filing 7 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Fifth Third Bank (Eble, Louis)
September 15, 2014 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Bagno Widlak on behalf of Fifth Third Bank. (Widlak, Anne)
September 15, 2014 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses Reliance on Plaintiff's Jury Demand and Certificate of Service by Fifth Third Bank. (Eble, Louis)
August 19, 2014 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Fifth Third Bank* (Huff, W.)
August 18, 2014 FILING FEE Received in the amount of $400.00 by Sheila Johnson - Receipt No. DET070760 [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (Huff, W.)
August 14, 2014 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Fee Not Paid. Correction due by 8/21/2014 (TMcg)
August 13, 2014 Filing 2 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kevin J. Kelly appearing on behalf of Sheila Johnson (Kelly, Kevin)
August 13, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY filed by Sheila Johnson against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Fee Required - Fee Not Paid. County of 1st Plaintiff: Genesee - County Where Action Arose: Genesee - County of 1st Defendant: Out of Country. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Mastromarco, Victor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Fifth Third Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Johnson
Represented By: Victor J. Mastromarco, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin J. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifth Third Bank
Represented By: Louis B. Eble
Represented By: Anne Bagno Widlak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?