MY Imagination, LLC v. M.Z. Berger & Co., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: MY Imagination, LLC
Defendant: M.Z. Berger & Co., Inc., M Z Berger & Co, Incorporated and MZB Imagination, LLC
Case Number: 2:2014cv13321
Filed: August 26, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Oakland
Presiding Judge: Avern Cohn
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Hluchaniuk
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL RECONSIDERATION (Doc. 137). Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT TO LIMIT PLAINTIFF TO NO MORE THAN NOMINAL DAMAGES (Doc. 122). Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER DENYING 100 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, (Doc. 68), GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, (Doc. 70), and DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS IN LIMINE REGARDING APPLICABLE LAW, (Doc. 66), and FOR DETERMINATION OF DAMAGES AVAILABLE, (Doc. 67). Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MY Imagination, LLC v. M.Z. Berger & Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MY Imagination, LLC
Represented By: Lawrence S. Gadd
Represented By: Theresa A. Pinch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.Z. Berger & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Herve Gouraige
Represented By: Kelly R. Houk
Represented By: Thomas M. Schehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Z Berger & Co, Incorporated
Represented By: Herve Gouraige
Represented By: Kelly R. Houk
Represented By: Thomas M. Schehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MZB Imagination, LLC
Represented By: Herve Gouraige
Represented By: Kelly R. Houk
Represented By: Thomas M. Schehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?