Bey v. Falk
Plaintiff: Christopher Lee-Murray Bey
Defendant: Adam Falk
Case Number: 2:2014cv13743
Filed: September 29, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Presiding Judge: Denise Page Hood
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER STAYING CASE and Administratively Closing Case. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Denying Canton Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration 56 . Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Denying Livonia Defendants' Motion for Rehearing or Reconsideration Per LR 7.1(h) 55 . Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Denying In Part and Granting In Part Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment 38 , 39 . Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bey v. Falk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Lee-Murray Bey
Represented By: Joel B. Sklar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Falk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?